Parker v. John W. Stone Oil Distributors, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Parker
Defendant: John W. Stone Oil Distributors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03666
Filed: April 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Anticipated Testimony of Dr. Archie Melcher, R. Doc. 64 ; (2) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Anticipated Testimony of Dr. Dennis Occhipinti, R. Doc. 65 ; (3) Plaintiff 9;s Motion to Exclude Certain Anticipated Testimony of Dr. Everett Robert, R. Doc. 66 ; and (4) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Anticipated Testimony of Dr. Richard Roniger 67 are DENIED. The Court again emphasizes that each of Plaintiff's motions pertains to anticipated testimony by Defendant's experts; if and when such testimony is elicited at trial, Plaintiff may object at that time. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/16/19. (dno)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 51 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/19/2019. (jeg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 29 Motion in Limine is hereby DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Motion in Limine is hereby DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Motion in Limine is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/28/2019. (jeg)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/14/2019. (jeg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. John W. Stone Oil Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Parker
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Stone Oil Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?