Lexon Insurance Company, Inc. v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Lexon Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv04245
Filed: April 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that defendant FDIC-C's 70 Motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/28/2020. (jls)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that defendant's 55 construed motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to count two of plaintiff's claim relative to repudiation of the Standby Letters of Credit ("SLOCs") (Emphasis ad ded); count three of plaintiff's claim for breach of contract; count four of plaintiff's claim relative to actual and compensatory damages; and count five of plaintiff's claim that SLOCs are not contracts. The amended complaint against FDIC-R is dismissed, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/25/2019. (jls)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that FDIC's 21 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, without prejudice to Lexon's right to bring a timely amended complaint, showing a viable claim, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/7/2018. (jls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexon Insurance Company, Inc. v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexon Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Marechal Cerise
Represented By: Omer Frederick Kuebel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?