Plaquemines Parish v. Riverwood Production Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Plaquemines Parish
Defendant: Riverwood Production Company, Inc., William G. Helis, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Graham Royalty, Ltd., Chevron USA Inc, William G Helis and Graham Exploration Ltd
Intervenor Plaintiff: Department of Natural Resources State of Louisiana and Jeff Landry in his official capacity as Louisiana Attorney General
Intervenor: Louisiana State
Case Number: 2:2018cv05217
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Plaquemines
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Amendment - Corrected Exhibits 1-86 & 1-95 by Chevron USA Inc, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #104 Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-95)(White, Alexandra) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (sa).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Amendment - Corrected Exhibits 1-115 by Chevron USA Inc, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #104 Memorandum. (White, Alexandra) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (sa).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE/BRIEF filed by Chevron USA Inc, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (White, Alexandra) Modified text on 11/1/2021 (sa).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY/BRIEF filed by Louisiana State and Plaquemines Parish re #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jay L. Brigham, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Exhibit 1-5, #7 Exhibit 1-6, #8 Exhibit 1-7, #9 Exhibit 1-8, #10 Exhibit 1-9, #11 Exhibit 1-10, #12 Exhibit 1-11, #13 Exhibit 1-12, #14 Exhibit 1-13, #15 Exhibit 1-14, #16 Exhibit 1-15, #17 Exhibit 1-16, #18 Exhibit 1-17, #19 Exhibit 1-18, #20 Exhibit 1-19, #21 Exhibit 1-20, #22 Exhibit 1-21, #23 Exhibit 1-22, #24 Exhibit 1-23, #25 Exhibit 1-24, #26 Exhibit 1-25, #27 Exhibit 1-26, #28 Exhibit 1-27, #29 Exhibit 1-28, #30 Exhibit 1-29, #31 Exhibit 1-30, #32 Exhibit 1-31, #33 Exhibit 1-32, #34 Exhibit 1-33, #35 Exhibit 1-34, #36 Exhibit 1-35, #37 Exhibit 1-36, #38 Exhibit 1-37, #39 Exhibit 1-38, #40 Exhibit 1-39, #41 Exhibit 1-40, #42 Exhibit 1-41, #43 Exhibit 1-42, #44 Exhibit 1-43, #45 Exhibit 1-44, #46 Exhibit 1-45, #47 Exhibit 1-46, #48 Exhibit 1-47, #49 Exhibit 1-48, #50 Exhibit 1-49, #51 Exhibit 1-50, #52 Exhibit 1-51, #53 Exhibit 1-52, #54 Exhibit 1-53, #55 Exhibit 1-54, #56 Exhibit 1-55, #57 Exhibit 1-56, #58 Exhibit 1-57, #59 Exhibit 1-58, #60 Exhibit 1-59, #61 Exhibit 1-60, #62 Exhibit 1-61, #63 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Susan Baur, #64 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Todd J. Wimberley, #65 Exhibit 3.1 to Declaration of Wimberley, #66 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Charles R. Norman, P.E., #67 Exhibit 4.1 to Norman CV, #68 Exhibit 5, #69 Exhibit 6, #70 Exhibit 7)(Marcello, Victor) (Attachment 18 replaced on 10/29/2021) (sa).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #107 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys. IT IS ORDERED that Monica Frois and Tyler Weidlich be WITHDRAWN as counsel for Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/13/2021. (sa)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Monica Frois and Tyler Weidlich as Attorney of Record by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheatwood, Roy)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #105 Notice (Other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is "Request/Statement of Oral Argument." Clerk took corrective action to change event. (sa)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #104 Memorandum/Brief re: Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Alexandra) Modified text/event on 10/12/2021 (sa).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Alfred M. ("A. J.") Gravel, #3 Exhibit 1-1 to Declaration of Gravel, #4 Exhibit 1-2 to Declaration of Gravel, #5 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Gravel, #6 Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of Gravel, #7 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Gravel, #8 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of Gravel, #9 Exhibit 1-7 to Declaration of Gravel, #10 Exhibit 1-8 to Declaration of Gravel, #11 Exhibit 1-9 to Declaration of Gravel, #12 Exhibit 1-10 to Declaration of Gravel, #13 Exhibit 1-11 to Declaration of Gravel, #14 Exhibit 1-12 to Declaration of Gravel, #15 Exhibit 1-13 to Declaration of Gravel, #16 Exhibit 1-14 to Declaration of Gravel, #17 Exhibit 1-15 to Declaration of Gravel, #18 Exhibit 1-16 to Declaration of Gravel, #19 Exhibit 1-17 to Declaration of Gravel, #20 Exhibit 1-18 to Declaration of Gravel, #21 Exhibit 1-19 to Declaration of Gravel, #22 Exhibit 1-20 to Declaration of Gravel, #23 Exhibit 1-21 to Declaration of Gravel, #24 Exhibit 1-22 to Declaration of Gravel, #25 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of Gravel, #26 Exhibit 1-24 to Declaration of Gravel, #27 Exhibit 1-25 to Declaration of Gravel, #28 Exhibit 1-26 to Declaration of Gravel, #29 Exhibit 1-27 to Declaration of Gravel, #30 Exhibit 1-28 to Declaration of Gravel, #31 Exhibit 1-29 to Declaration of Gravel, #32 Exhibit 1-30 to Declaration of Gravel, #33 Exhibit 1-31 to Declaration of Gravel, #34 Exhibit 1-32 to Declaration of Gravel, #35 Exhibit 1-33 to Declaration of Gravel, #36 Exhibit 1-34 to Declaration of Gravel, #37 Exhibit 1-35 to Declaration of Gravel, #38 Exhibit 1-36 to Declaration of Gravel, #39 Exhibit 1-37 to Declaration of Gravel, #40 Exhibit 1-38 to Declaration of Gravel, #41 Exhibit 1-39 to Declaration of Gravel, #42 Exhibit 1-40 to Declaration of Gravel, #43 Exhibit 1-41 to Declaration of Gravel, #44 Exhibit 1-42 to Declaration of Gravel, #45 Exhibit 1-43 to Declaration of Gravel, #46 Exhibit 1-44 to Declaration of Gravel, #47 Exhibit 1-45 to Declaration of Gravel, #48 Exhibit 1-46 to Declaration of Gravel, #49 Exhibit 1-47 to Declaration of Gravel, #50 Exhibit 1-48 to Declaration of Gravel, #51 Exhibit 1-49 to Declaration of Gravel, #52 Exhibit 1-50 to Declaration of Gravel, #53 Exhibit 1-51 to Declaration of Gravel, #54 Exhibit 1-52 to Declaration of Gravel, #55 Exhibit 1-53 to Declaration of Gravel, #56 Exhibit 1-54 to Declaration of Gravel, #57 Exhibit 1-55 to Declaration of Gravel, #58 Exhibit 1-56 to Declaration of Gravel, #59 Exhibit 1-57 to Declaration of Gravel, #60 Exhibit 1-58 to Declaration of Gravel, #61 Exhibit 1-59 to Declaration of Gravel, #62 Exhibit 1-60 to Declaration of Gravel, #63 Exhibit 1-61 to Declaration of Gravel, #64 Exhibit 1-62 to Declaration of Gravel, #65 Exhibit 1-63 to Declaration of Gravel, #66 Exhibit 1-64 to Declaration of Gravel, #67 Exhibit 1-65 to Declaration of Gravel, #68 Exhibit 1-66 to Declaration of Gravel, #69 Exhibit 1-67 to Declaration of Gravel, #70 Exhibit 1-68 to Declaration of Gravel, #71 Exhibit 1-69 to Declaration of Gravel, #72 Exhibit 1-70 to Declaration of Gravel, #73 Exhibit 1-71 to Declaration of Gravel, #74 Exhibit 1-72 to Declaration of Gravel, #75 Exhibit 1-73 to Declaration of Gravel, #76 Exhibit 1-74 to Declaration of Gravel, #77 Exhibit 1-75 to Declaration of Gravel, #78 Exhibit 1-76 to Declaration of Gravel, #79 Exhibit 1-77 to Declaration of Gravel, #80 Exhibit 1-78 to Declaration of Gravel, #81 Exhibit 1-79 to Declaration of Gravel, #82 Exhibit 1-80 to Declaration of Gravel, #83 Exhibit 1-81 to Declaration of Gravel, #84 Exhibit 1-82 to Declaration of Gravel, #85 Exhibit 1-83 to Declaration of Gravel, #86 Exhibit 1-84 to Declaration of Gravel, #87 Exhibit 1-85 to Declaration of Gravel, #88 Exhibit 1-86 to Declaration of Gravel, #89 Exhibit 1-87 to Declaration of Gravel, #90 Exhibit 1-88 to Declaration of Gravel, #91 Exhibit 1-89 to Declaration of Gravel, #92 Exhibit 1-90 to Declaration of Gravel, #93 Exhibit 1-91 to Declaration of Gravel, #94 Exhibit 1-92 to Declaration of Gravel, #95 Exhibit 1-93 to Declaration of Gravel, #96 Exhibit 1-94 to Declaration of Gravel, #97 Exhibit 1-95 to Declaration of Gravel, #98 Exhibit 1-96 to Declaration of Gravel, #99 Exhibit 1-97 to Declaration of Gravel, #100 Exhibit 1-98 to Declaration of Gravel, #101 Exhibit 1-99 to Declaration of Gravel, #102 Exhibit 1-100 to Declaration of Gravel, #103 Exhibit 1-101 to Declaration of Gravel, #104 Exhibit 1-102 to Declaration of Gravel, #105 Exhibit 1-103 to Declaration of Gravel, #106 Exhibit 1-104 to Declaration of Gravel, #107 Exhibit 1-105 to Declaration of Gravel, #108 Exhibit 1-106 to Declaration of Gravel, #109 Exhibit 1-107 to Declaration of Gravel, #110 Exhibit 1-108 to Declaration of Gravel, #111 Exhibit 1-109 to Declaration of Gravel, #112 Exhibit 1-110 to Declaration of Gravel, #113 Exhibit 1-111 to Declaration of Gravel, #114 Exhibit 1-112 to Declaration of Gravel, #115 Exhibit 1-113 to Declaration of Gravel, #116 Exhibit 1-114 to Declaration of Gravel, #117 Exhibit 1-115 to Declaration of Gravel, #118 Exhibit 1-116 to Declaration of Gravel, #119 Exhibit 1-117 to Declaration of Gravel, #120 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Louis F. Gilbert, #121 Exhibit 2.1 thru 2-20 to Declaration of Louis F. Gilbert, #122 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Janice M. Phillips, #123 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Ryan Caughey, #124 Exhibit 4-1 to Declaration of Ryan Caughey)(White, Alexandra) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sa).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM filed by Louisiana State and Plaquemines Parish re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Marcello, Victor) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (sa).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING #101 Motion for Scheduling Order. IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties file briefs in accordance with the Fifth Circuit's directive pursuant to the schedule as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/15/2021. (sa)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION For Scheduling Order by Louisiana State(through the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources Office of Coastal Management and its Secretary, Thomas F. Harris), Louisiana State(ex rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General), Plaquemines Parish, Conoco Phillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, and Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marcello, Victor) Modified filers on 9/15/2021 (sa).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/7/2021 as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED IN PART and REVERSED IN PART, and the cause is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party to bear own costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court. USCA Judges: HO, ENGELHARDT, and OLDHAM. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Transmittal Letter)(sa)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER AND REASONS dismissing without prejudice #97 Motion Order Directing Clerk to Mail Certified Copy of Remand Order. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/11/2020. (cwa)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #97 Joint MOTION for Order Directing Clerk to Mail Certified Copy of Remand Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mascari, Pamela)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Order Directing Clerk to Mail Certified Copy of Remand Order by Louisiana State(through the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources Office of Coastal Management and its Secretary, Thomas F. Harris), Louisiana State(ex rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General), Plaquemines Parish. Motion set for submission on September 16, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - August 10, 2020 Fifth Circuit Ruling, #3 Proposed Order)(Marcello, Victor) Modified to add opposition language & set Motion for Submission before Judge Feldman on 9/16/2020 (sa).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER of USCA as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. IT IS ORDERED that appellees' opposed joint motion to dismiss the appeal of federal question findings in order of remand is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' opposed joint motion to vacate the stay order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana is GRANTED. USCA Judge Name: HO, ENGELHARDT, and OLDHAM (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sa)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER of USCA as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. IT is ordered that the appellees' motion to expedite the appeals is GRANTED. USCA Circuit Judge Name: JAMES C. HO. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sa)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted Thomas Allen Lorenzen re #88 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 19-30492. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Jennifer Clark, Ryan Morris, Peter D. Keisler, Eric Julian Mayer, Alexandra Giselle White, Deborah DeRoche Kuchler, Michele Hale DeShazo, Martin Alan Stern, Jeffrey E. Richardson, Donald W. Price, Ryan Michael Seidemann, Victor Lynn Marcello re #88 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 19-30491. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (adp)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #88 Notice of Appeal. (Transcript is already on file) (Keisler, Peter)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 USCA Case Number 19-30492 appealed to United States Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit for #88 Notice of Appeal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (clc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on April 10, 2019 before Judge Martin L. C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (rsg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 USCA Case Number 19-30492 appealed to U.S. Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals for #88 Notice of Appeal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Conoco Phillips Company. (clc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation as to #79 ORDER AND REASONS. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 053L-7703257.) (White, Alexandra)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #80 Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal. ORDERED that this Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' #79 Motion to Remand is stayed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/11/19. (clc)(CC: 25th JDC, Plaquemines Parish)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #85 Reply to Response to Motion. **Please disregard earlier issued Deficiency. Document no longer deemed Deficient.** (clc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #80 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, . (White, Alexandra) Modified on 6/11/2019 (clc).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaquemines Parish re #80 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Day)(Marcello, Victor)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana State, Louisiana State re #80 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court . (Price, Donald)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #81 Motion to Expedite #80 Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal and to Set Briefing Schedule. ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal and to Set Briefing Schedule be and hereby is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be due no later than June 5, 2019, Defendants' reply shall be due no later than June 10, 2019; FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal shall be submitted for consideration on June 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/29/19. (CC: 25th JDC, Plaquemines Parish) (clc)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Alexandra)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Stay re #79 ORDER AND REASONS to Remand to State Court by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support , #2 Proposed Order , #3 Notice of Submission )(White, Alexandra)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER and REASONS - Before the Court are motions to remand by Plaquemines Parish and the State of Louisiana #35 and #36 . IT IS ORDERED that the motions to remand are hereby GRANTED, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/28/2019. (cbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Remand Letter) (cbs).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(White, Alexandra)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2019 re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court. Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand to State Court (Doc. 35 and Doc. 36) are argued by counsel and taken under submission by the Court. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (cbs)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #36 Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(White, Alexandra) Modified text on 4/10/2019 (clc).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re #60 Reply to Response to Motion, Letter to The Honorable Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54 Stat. 892, #2 Exhibit 6 Fed. Reg. 6680)(White, Alexandra) Modified on 4/9/2019 (clc).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle Marney White terminated for Intervenor-Plaintiff the State of Louisiana, ex rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/14/2019. (cbs)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Michelle M. White and Michael S. Heier as Attorney by Louisiana State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Seidemann, Ryan) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/14/2019) (jeg).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER : ORDERED that the oral hearing scheduled for March 20, 2019 on the plaintiffs' motions to remand is hereby continued to April 10, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Each side shall have 30 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/12/2019.(jeg)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #70 MOTION to Continue Hearing. ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiffs Motions to Remand set for March 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is continued until March 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Each side shall be allotted 30 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/1/19.(clc)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing (Unopposed) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mascari, Pamela)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the oral hearing scheduled for February 6, 2019 on the plaintiffs' motions to remand is hereby continued to March 13, 2019, at 10:00 a.m.. Each side shall be allotted 30 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/28/2019.(cbs)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Defendants to #47 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #48 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand. (Memorandum in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation filed in WDLA, 18-677) (clc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion for Leave to File Objections to Report andRecommendation to Remand in Similarly Situated Case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/10/18. (clc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Substitute Exhibit #4, Affidavit of Charles R. Norman, P.E. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/10/18. (clc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER : ORDERED that the oral hearing scheduled for December 12, 2018 on the plaintiffs' motions to remand is hereby continued to February 6, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Each side shall be allotted 30 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/10/18.(clc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #62 MOTION to Substitute Exhibit. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Objections to Report and Recommendation to Remand in Similarly Situated Case by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Alexandra) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (jeg).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Substitute Exhibit by Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit)(Marcello, Victor) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (jeg).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Setting Hearing with Oral Argument on #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/6/18.(clc)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(jeg) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/10/2018 per Rec. Doc. #66) (clc).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in support to Their Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/28/2018. (jeg)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Parish of Plaquemines' Motion to Remand [Doc. 47] by Plaquemines Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Marcello, Victor)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Louisiana State re #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit)(jeg)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Reply memorandum in support of Intervenors' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/21/2018. (jeg)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter D. Keisler for Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/20/2018. (cbs)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter D. Keisler (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7239461). ** Filing attorney did not include ECF registration form to Motion. ECF registration form subsequently provided to Clerk, and was added as attachment. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Intervenors' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand [Doc. 48] by Louisiana State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42)(Price, Donald)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter D. Keisler (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7239461) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Mascari, Pamela) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (jeg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #4 ECF Registration) (jeg).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Oral Argument on #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/12/2018.(clc)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #47 Response to Motion. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is RESPONSE/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation regarding #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court and #35 Motion to Remand. (White, Alexandra)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(White, Alexandra)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106, #108 Exhibit 107, #109 Exhibit 108, #110 Exhibit 109, #111 Exhibit 110, #112 Exhibit 111, #113 Exhibit 112, #114 Exhibit 113, #115 Exhibit 114, #116 Exhibit 115, #117 Exhibit 116, #118 Exhibit 117, #119 Exhibit 118, #120 Exhibit 119, #121 Exhibit 120, #122 Exhibit 121, #123 Exhibit 122, #124 Exhibit 123, #125 Exhibit 124, #126 Exhibit 125, #127 Exhibit 126, #128 Exhibit 127, #129 Exhibit 128, #130 Exhibit 129)(White, Alexandra) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (jeg).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw Shannon A Shelton as Attorney for Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/13/2018. (cbs)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Shannon A Shelton as Attorney by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Juneau, Claire)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Reopen Case. FURTHER ORDERED that a submission date of October 17, 2018, is set for the motions to remand. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/6/2018. (clc)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reopen Case , Lift Stay, and Set Submission Date of October 3, 2018 for the Motions to Remand by Louisiana State, Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Opposition to Submission Date)(Marcello, Victor) Modified text on 9/4/2018 (cbs).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE re Relatedness by Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish . (Marcello, Victor) Modified text on 8/9/2018 (clc).
August 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Response by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation to #40 Cross- Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Alexandra) Modified text on 8/6/2018 (clc).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CROSS-NOTICE by Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish re #39 Notice (Other) and of JPML Ruling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Memo in Opposition to Motion for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B Plaintiff-Intervenor Memo in Opposition to Motion for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings)(Carmouche, John) Modified text on 8/6/2018 (clc).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation of JPML Ruling and Related Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, #3 Exhibit 2 to Appendix)(DeShazo, Michele)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: ORDERED that the defendants' #10 Motion to Stay is GRANTED and that the matter is stayed and administratively closed pending a decision of the MDL Panel. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/25/2018.(clc)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 **DEFICIENT* EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Mascari, Pamela) Modified on 6/22/2018 (clc). Modified on 6/22/2018 (clc).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Louisiana State. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 16, #5 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 16, #6 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 of 16, #7 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 of 16, #8 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 of 16, #9 Exhibit 1 - Part 6 of 16, #10 Exhibit 1 - Part 7 of 16, #11 Exhibit 1 - Part 8 of 16, #12 Exhibit 1 - Part 9 of 16, #13 Exhibit 1 - Part 10 of 16, #14 Exhibit 1 - Part 11 of 16, #15 Exhibit 1 - Part 12 of 16, #16 Exhibit 1 - Part 13 of 16, #17 Exhibit 1 - Part 14 of 16, #18 Exhibit 1 - Part 15 of 16, #19 Exhibit 1 - Part 16 of 16, #20 Exhibits 2-4)(Price, Donald)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaquemines Parish, Louisiana State. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1 part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit 1 part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit 1 part 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit 2 - 13)(Marcello, Victor)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination of MDL Hearing Session and Stay Orders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McNeal, Robert)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/13/2018. (clc)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination. (clc)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply re Motion for Stay Pending MDL Determination. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/13/2018. (clc)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUR-REPLY filed by Louisiana State, Plaquemines Parish re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination. (Attachment(s) : #1 Exhibit A) (clc).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/13/2018. (clc)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memo in Support of Motion for Remand by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Conference, #3 Proposed Order)(Juneau, Claire) Modified on 6/14/2018 (clc).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana State(through the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources Office of Coastal Management and its Secretary, Thomas F. Harris), Plaquemines Parish re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memo in Support of Motion for Remand . (Marcello, Victor)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memo in Support of Motion for Remand by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Eric) Modified on 6/13/2018 (clc).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memo in Support of Motion for Remand by Louisiana State(through the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources Office of Coastal Management and its Secretary, Thomas F. Harris), Louisiana State(ex rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General), Plaquemines Parish. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to File in Excess of Page Limits, #2 Proposed Order re Motion for Leave to file Excess of Page Limits, #3 Proposed Pleading- Proposed Joint Motion for Remand, #4 Proposed Pleading- Memo in Support of Motion for Remand, #5 Proposed Pleading- Notice of Submission re Motion for Remand, #6 Proposed Pleading- Proposed Order on Motion for Remand, #7 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 14, #8 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 14, #9 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 14, #10 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 14, #11 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 14, #12 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 6 of 14, #13 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 7 of 14, #14 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 8 of 14, #15 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 9 of 14, #16 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 10 of 14, #17 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 11 of 14, #18 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 12 of 14, #19 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 13 of 14, #20 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, Part 14 of 14, #21 Proposed Pleading- Exhibits 2 - 6, #22 Proposed Pleading- Exhibits 7 - 19, #23 Proposed Pleading- Exhibits 20 - 33, #24 Proposed Pleading- Exhibits 34 - 47)(Marcello, Victor)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeShazo, Michele)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(DeShazo, Michele)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition of Motion to Stay . (DeShazo, Michele)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 **DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition of Motion to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(DeShazo, Michele) Modified text on 6/11/2018 (jeg).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition of Motion to Stay by Plaquemines Parish, Louisiana State(ex rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General), Louisiana State(through the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources Office of Coastal Management and its Secretary, Thomas F. Harris). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)(Marcello, Victor) Modified text on 6/8/2018 (jeg).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2)(clc)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/6/2018. (clc)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Exxon Mobil Corporation (McNeal, Robert)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1447(B) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit A-12, #13 Exhibit A-13, #14 Exhibit A-14, #15 Exhibit A-15, #16 Exhibit A-16, #17 Exhibit A-17, #18 Exhibit A-18, #19 Exhibit A-19, #20 Exhibit A-20, #21 Exhibit A-21, #22 Exhibit A-22, #23 Exhibit A-23, #24 Exhibit A-24, #25 Exhibit A-25, #26 Exhibit B)(Cobb, Shannon)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re Rec. Doc. 10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Eric)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana, State re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination . (Seidemann, Ryan)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company (DeShazo, Michele)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaquemines Parish re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination . (Marcello, Victor)
June 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. of Stay Entered in the Western District of Louisiana Pending MDL Determination. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Alexandra)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Juneau, Claire)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by William G Helis (Hughes, Edward)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion before the JPML for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28:1407. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(clc)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Juneau, Claire)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/24/2018.(nef: Judge Feldman, Mag. Judge North, blg, cc)(jls)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/24/2018. (NEF: Judge Daniel E. Knowles,III) (ajn)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th JDC, Plaquemines Parish, case number 60-989, B (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-6895993) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Exhibit 1-5, #7 Exhibit 1-6, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Exhibit 35, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43, #50 Exhibit 44, #51 Exhibit 45, #52 Exhibit 46, #53 Exhibit 47, #54 Exhibit 48, #55 Exhibit 49, #56 Exhibit 50, #57 Exhibit 51)(Cobb, Shannon) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/23/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 5/24/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaquemines Parish v. Riverwood Production Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Department of Natural Resources State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeff Landry in his official capacity as Louisiana Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaquemines Parish
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: Andre' Collins Gaudin
Represented By: Brandon J. Taylor
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Bruce D. Burglass, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher D. Martin
Represented By: Darren David Sumich
Represented By: David Allen Parsiola
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: Leah C. Poole
Represented By: Philip Francis Cossich, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Scott Owen Gaspard
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverwood Production Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Helis
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Michele Hale DeShazo
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Alexandra Roselli Lamb
Represented By: Glen Marion Pilie
Represented By: Jamie D. Rhymes
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Martin Alan Stern
Represented By: Matthew A. Woolf
Represented By: Michael P. Cash
Represented By: Monica Frois
Represented By: Roy Clifton Cheatwood
Represented By: Tyler Weidlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Claire E. Juneau
Represented By: Eric Julian Mayer
Represented By: Pamela Roman Mascari
Represented By: Shannon S Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Royalty, Ltd.
Represented By: John C. Anjier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Claire E. Juneau
Represented By: Eric Julian Mayer
Represented By: Johnny W. Carter
Represented By: Pamela Roman Mascari
Represented By: Peter D. Keisler
Represented By: Shannon A Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Helis
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Exploration Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Louisiana State
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: Michelle Marney White
Represented By: Wilbur Lafayette Stiles, III
Represented By: James Blake Canfield
Represented By: Donald W. Price
Represented By: Megan K. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?