Jackson et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene, Linda I McClarty, Nicole Joseph, Roosevelt Jones, Nathan L Smith, Blandy Young, Jr., Roland J Scioneaux, Tyronne K Creecy, Sr., Lawrence Kelson, Kenny L Gray, Lori A Dennis, Joseph K Collar, Patricia A Hamilton, Walter J Gerard, III, Gerard Jean-Baptiste, Latricha M Landry, Stephanie D Elsayed, Ernest P Joseph, Herbert Johnson, Tammy M Toney, Sharell A Milton, Barbara R Meloncon, Barbara M Polk, Letitia T Parquet, Patricia W Parrilla, Allison M Joseph, Brenda M Toney, Ava L Felton, Winenell Batiste, Jr., Earl Sanders, Roland Keller, Sr., Rhonda T Eugene, Rose M Smith, Barbara A Snyder-Burton, Deborah J Johnson, Sabrina M Jackson, James A Cambre, Demetris H Haynie, Thenetta D Jones, Gregory Bernard, Janet M Johnson, William F Johnson, Desiree N Mills, Denise S Brown, Milton Wingate, Jr., Donna C Jackson, Anita A English, Grady Milfort, Roline M Keller, LaShonte' J Smith, Francis D Gatlin, Merian M Frank, Sandra A Sterling, Curtis Young, Sr., Kyron J Watkins, Wade Williams, Doris W Cambre, Barbara E Taylor, Mary L. Atkins, Linda P Tassin, Marie Jean-Baptiste, Kathy M Cook, Flavin J Keller, Lisha M Brown, Cynthia W Collins, Kenneth E Sims, Dalnisha N Young, Patricia L Williams, Peggy L Conrad, Demetria Bailey, August M Tassin, Richard L Adams, Troyla S Keller, Ilana L Burton, Gordon M McClarty, Kennedy M Cook, Kelly F Hudgins, Ernest Dunn, Jalen R Toney, Theodore Young, Lydia F Pinson, Zelvinlynn M Smith, Melvin L Batiste, Jr., Winenell Batiste, Walter J. Gerard, III, Tyronne K. Creecy, Sr. and Melvin L. Batiste, Jr.
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Dow Chemical Company and DowDuPont Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06692
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St John the Baptist
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the plaintiffs #13 Request for oral argument is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the #10 Motion to Remand is hereby continued to September 5, 2018, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/21/2018.(clc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Donna C Jackson regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Bruno, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc., E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Kuchler, Deborah)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Percy, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna C Jackson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Hugh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance with Removal Procedure Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) and Local Rule 3.2 by Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc., E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doguet, Joshua)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to respond. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' petition is extended until 30 days after any ruling by the Court on Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/16/2018. (clc)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/16/2018.(blg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. ALSO, filing attorney did not selectDowDuPoint Inc. as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (sbs) Modified text on 7/16/2018 (sbs).
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Dow Chemical Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc., E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 7/16/2018 (sbs).
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Dow Chemical Company of related case(s) 17-cv-7668 c/w 18-5739. (Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 7/16/2018 (sbs).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th JDC, St. John the Baptist Parish, case number 72319 "B" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7001302) filed by Dow Chemical Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, DowDuPont Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party DowDuPont Inc.(pty:dft).(Doguet, Joshua) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2018) (sbs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/16/2018) (sbs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/16/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 7/16/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda I McClarty
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Joseph
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Jones
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan L Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blandy Young, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland J Scioneaux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyronne K Creecy, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Kelson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny L Gray
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A Dennis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K Collar
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Hamilton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J Gerard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Jean-Baptiste
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricha M Landry
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie D Elsayed
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest P Joseph
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy M Toney
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharell A Milton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara R Meloncon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara M Polk
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia T Parquet
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia W Parrilla
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison M Joseph
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M Toney
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava L Felton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winenell Batiste, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Sanders
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Keller, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda T Eugene
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose M Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Snyder-Burton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina M Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Cambre
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetris H Haynie
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thenetta D Jones
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bernard
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet M Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree N Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise S Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Wingate, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna C Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita A English
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady Milfort
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roline M Keller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShonte' J Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis D Gatlin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merian M Frank
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra A Sterling
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Young, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyron J Watkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris W Cambre
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara E Taylor
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Atkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda P Tassin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Jean-Baptiste
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy M Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flavin J Keller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisha M Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia W Collins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E Sims
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalnisha N Young
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy L Conrad
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria Bailey
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August M Tassin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Adams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troyla S Keller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilana L Burton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon M McClarty
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy M Cook
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly F Hudgins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Dunn
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalen R Toney
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Young
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia F Pinson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelvinlynn M Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin L Batiste, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winenell Batiste
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J. Gerard, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyronne K. Creecy, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Batiste, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denka Performance Elastomer LLC
Represented By: Justin J. Marocco
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Represented By: Michael A. Chernekoff
Represented By: Brett S. Venn
Represented By: Michael R. Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Bradley H Weidenhammer
Represented By: Stanley M Wash
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Rebecca C Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Kevin T Van Wart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Bradley H Weidenhammer
Represented By: Stanley M Wash
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Rebecca C Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Kevin T Van Wart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DowDuPont Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Bradley H Weidenhammer
Represented By: Stanley M Wash
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Rebecca C Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Kevin T Van Wart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?