Simms v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Sedrick Simms
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2018cv06748
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) as to Darrel Vannoy answer due 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/23/2018. (mmv)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Darrel Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher James Ponoroff added to party Darrel Vannoy(pty:dft).(Ponoroff, Christopher)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Attorney General's Office on 7/27/2018. (clc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Orleans Parish Clerk of Criminal Court, Orleans Parish District Attorney's Office on 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return)(clc)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney and Clerk for Orleans Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/24/2018.(mmv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (mmv).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/24/2018. (mmv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sedrick Simms. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (jls)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Sedrick Simms. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits A-C, #3 Exhibits D-K, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simms v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedrick Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Christopher James Ponoroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?