Rivera v. Huntington Ingalls Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judith Punch Rivera
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Arrowood Indemnity Company, Eagle, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Owens Illinois, Inc, Foster Wheeler, LLC, AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc., Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06795
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand (Rec. Doc. #9 ) was argued by counsel and taken under submission by the Court. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sa)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that oral argument previously set for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. regarding #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court is RESET for 9/12/2018 9:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Further Ordered that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages contained therein, by Huntington Ingalls, Inc..(Trapolin, Edward)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the request for #18 Oral Argument is GRANTED, and oral argument on the Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #9 ) is SET for September 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and all briefs shall be submitted by August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/21/2018.(sa)
August 18, 2018 Filing 18 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. regarding #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Trapolin, Edward)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Judith Punch Rivera re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ecm)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/17/18. (ecm)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Judith Punch Rivera. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(Williams, L.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Trapolin, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents a defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/26/2018.(mmv) (NEF: J. Milazzo, MJ vanMeerveld, Case Mgrs)
July 26, 2018 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 8/22/2018 before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. No further action is necessary. (sa)
July 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand (to Plaintiffs First Supplemental and Amending Petition) by AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc..Attorney James H. Brown, Jr added to party AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.(pty:dft).(Brown, James)
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Judith Punch Rivera. Motion will be submitted on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Notice of Submission, #9 Proposed Order) (Williams, L.) Modified text/submission on 7/26/2018 (sa).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John Joseph Hainkel, III, Angela M. Bowlin, James H. Brown, Jr, Magali Ann Puente-Martin, Kelsey A. Eagan, Kelly L. Long, Lacey Taylor McCoy for Foster Wheeler, LLC. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/25/18. (ecm)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Foster Wheeler, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James H. Brown, Jr added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC.(pty:dft).(Brown, James) Modified on 7/25/2018 (sa).
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Owens-Illinois, Inc..Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Owens-Illinois, Inc.(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Notice - The Petition for Damages attached to #1 Notice of Removal lists counsel from State Court who have not been admitted to practice in this Court (Attorneys Natalie A. Williams and Alexis C. Normand). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this Court's Procedures for Admission. Future filings which lists attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 will not be accepted. (sa)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Trapolin, Edward)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-8462 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7009610) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Inc.(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 7/19/2018 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Huntington Ingalls Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Stephen Jared Austin
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Stephen Jared Austin
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Illinois, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMEC Foster Wheeler Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Lonegrass
Represented By: Rodger Gregory Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Cougill
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Represented By: Jamie M Zanovec
Represented By: Jennifer H. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Punch Rivera
Represented By: John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.
Represented By: L. Eric Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?