Nolasco v. Crockett, et al
Plaintiff: Josue Benavides and Josue Benavides Nolasco
Defendant: USCIS, Stanley Crockett and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv07101
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; U.S. Department of Homeland Security General Counsel served on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Process Clerk served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Stanley Crockett served, but no date provided. (mm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael W. Gahagan of Complaint, Summons and Exhibit 1 served on U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Process Clerk on 08/09/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (mm).
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael W. Gahagan of Complaint, Summons and Exhibit 1 served on Stanley Crockett. (Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (mm).
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael W. Gahagan of Complaint, Summons and Exhibit 1 served on U.S. Department of Homeland Security General Counsel on 08/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (mm).
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael W. Gahagan of Complaint, Summons and Exhibit 1 served on U.S. Attorney General on 08/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (mm).
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stanley Crockett, U.S. Attorney-New Orleans, Attorney General of U.S., Secretary of Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mm)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7031826) filed by Josue Benavides Nolasco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Josue Benavides Nolasco(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 7/31/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolasco v. Crockett, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Benavides
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Benavides Nolasco
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?