Borrero v. Crockett et al
Plaintiff: Liliana Borrero
Defendant: Cindy Gomez, Stanley Crockett, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv07253
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing fee paid from Liliana Borrero for Anthony Dominguez re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (gk)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Richard Dominguez. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 09/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (am)
September 22, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Liliana Borrero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gahagan, Michael)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Issued. Clerk corrected the Summons by correcting the spelling of the name Liliana Borrero, and replaced the images with the corrected Summons, which are also attached hereto. (am)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stanley Crockett, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: # 5 Summons) (am). (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/2/2018) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/2/2018) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/2/2018) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/2/2018) (am). ( Modified on 8/2/2018 (am).
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7036892) filed by Liliana Borrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Liliana Borrero(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borrero v. Crockett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Borrero
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?