Collins, et al v. Benton, et al
Plaintiff: Wayland Collins, Alvin Polk and Candy Kelly
Defendant: Mark Ingle, John C. Benton d/b/a Q&M Motor Transports, Northland Insurance Company and John C. Benton
Case Number: 2:2018cv07465
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Morgan J. Wells, Jr, Lee M. Peacocke for John C. Benton and Northland Insurance Company. Attorney Barbara Malik Weller terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/25/2018. (am)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Morgan J. Wells, Jr. to be substituted in place of Barbara Malik Weller by John C. Benton, Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weller, Barbara)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mark Ingle. (mm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to Mark Ingle filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Baer, Jason)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Morgan J. Wells, Jr. to be substituted in place of Barbara Malik Weller by John C. Benton, Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weller, Barbara) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (mm).
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Unexecuted. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Mark Ingle. (Baer, Jason) Modified on event 9/20/2018 (mm).
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John C. Benton, Northland Insurance Company.(Weller, Barbara)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; John C. Benton served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018; Northland Insurance Company served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Baer, Jason)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #4 Motion is GRANTED. Defendants John C.Benton d/b/a Q & M Motor Transports and Northland Insurance Company are granted an additional twenty-one (21) days to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/24/2018. (mmv)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by John C. Benton, Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of No Opposition)Attorney Barbara Malik Weller added to party John C. Benton(pty:dft), Attorney Barbara Malik Weller added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Weller, Barbara) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (mmv).
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John C. Benton, Mark Ingle, Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mm)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Ingle, John C. Benton d/b/a Q&M Motor Transports, Northland Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7047416) filed by Wayland Collins, Alvin Polk, Candy Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Jason M. Baer added to party Wayland Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Jason M. Baer added to party Candy Kelly(pty:pla), Attorney Jason M. Baer added to party Alvin Polk(pty:pla).(Baer, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins, et al v. Benton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayland Collins
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Vanessa Motta
Represented By: Joshua A Stein
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Polk
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Vanessa Motta
Represented By: Joshua A Stein
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Kelly
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Vanessa Motta
Represented By: Joshua A Stein
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Benton d/b/a Q&M Motor Transports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara Malik Weller
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Lee M. Peacocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Benton
Represented By: Barbara Malik Weller
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Lee M. Peacocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?