Marzett v. Tigner et al
Plaintiff: Delmon Marzett
Defendant: Libby Tigner, Major Poole, John Doe, Jim Doe, Capt Davis, Marlin N. Gusman, Joe Doe and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2018cv07473
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: A preliminary conference is hereby SCHEDULED for Thursday, 10/25/2018, at 9:45 a.m., before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. The parties shall participate in the conference via telephone with the Magistrate Judges office initiating the call. The purpose of the conference is to determine whether all parties will consent to proceed to trial before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge and to select a trial date, if appropriate.The Warden of the Dixon Correctional Institute is hereby ORDERED to have Delmon Marzett, #303968, made available by telephone for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 10/1/2018. (cc: Warden Dixon Correctional Inst US Mail)(caa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Marlin N. Gusman.Attorney Freeman Rudolph Matthews added to party Marlin N. Gusman(pty:dft).(Matthews, Freeman)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marlin N. Gusman served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (sbs)
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Marlin N. Gusman. (caa)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to issue summons with respect to Orleans Parish Sheriff Marlin N. Gusman and forward same to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/9/2018. (cc: USM)(caa)
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00110. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mmv)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT adopting #11 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the claims against Major Poole be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Marzett's claims against Marlin Gusman and the John Doe transportation officers from Orleans Parish are SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to Eastern District of Louisiana. An order regarding service of process on the remaining Defendants will be issued in due course. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/2/2018. (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that the claims against Major Poole be DENIED and DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Marzett's claims against Sheriff Gusman and John Doe Defendants be SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to Eastern District of Louisiana/ Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/6/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Davis, Jim Doe, Joe Doe, John Doe, Marlin N Gusman, Poole, Libby Tigner filed by Delmon Marzett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 6/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/8/2018. (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $32.61. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/1/2018. (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delmon Marzett. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Davis, Jim Doe, Joe Doe, John Doe, Marlin N Gusman, Poole, Libby Tigner filed by Delmon Marzett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delmon Marzett. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/6/2018) (Thigpen, M). [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
January 29, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Davis, Jim Doe, Joe Doe, John Doe, Marlin N Gusman, Poole, Libby Tigner with Jury Demand filed by Delmon Marzett. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Complaint not on approved forms. [Transferred from lawd on 8/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marzett v. Tigner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmon Marzett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libby Tigner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin N. Gusman
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?