LNV Corporation v. Vira

Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Defendant: Arvind N. Vira
Undetermined: Arvind Vira
Case Number: 2:2018cv07478
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
0 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
1 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Arvind N. Vira answer due 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/10/2018. (ecm)
September 9, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Arvind N. Vira. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew P. Chenevert added to party Arvind N. Vira(pty:dft).(Chenevert, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Arvind N. Vira served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Janke, Benjamin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arvind N. Vira. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Arvind N. Vira filed by LNV Corporation re #1 Complaint,. (Janke, Benjamin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Attachments have duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arvind N. Vira (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7048455) filed by LNV Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) Attorney Benjamin W. Janke added to party LNV Corporation(pty:pla).(Janke, Benjamin) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LNV Corporation v. Vira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Arvind Vira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin W. Janke
Represented By: Margaret Ann Mentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvind N. Vira
Represented By: Matthew P. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?