Hillery v. Ulivi, et al
Plaintiff: Breal L Hillery
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Zingg A Ulivi
Case Number: 2:2018cv07516
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Rec. Doc. #4 ) is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/29/2018. (sa)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Document. IT IS ORDERED that the Exhibits in Rec. Doc. 1-2 and 1-3 attached to the Notice of Removal be filed and kept under seal. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/22/2018. (sa)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, by Great Northern Insurance Company, Zingg A Ulivi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rolling, Conrad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, Zingg A Ulivi re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rolling, Conrad)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance Response to Directive of L.R. 3.2 by Great Northern Insurance Company, Zingg A Ulivi re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rolling, Conrad)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 *Filed in error, attached to Rec. Doc. 4* NOTICE by Breal L Hillery . (McGinity, Douglas) Modified on 8/14/2018 (sa).
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Zingg A Ulivi.(Rolling, Conrad)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breal L Hillery. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(McGinity, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #2 Proposed Order #3 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) Modified submission date/additional attachments on 8/14/2018 (sa).
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zingg A Ulivi, and Great Northern Insurance Company. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2018-2518 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7050403) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company and Zingg A Ulivi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Conrad C Rolling added to party Great Northern Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rolling, Conrad) Modified text/filers on 8/9/2018 (sa). (Attachments 1 & 5 reduced size & replaced on 8/9/2018) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillery v. Ulivi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Conrad C Rolling
Represented By: Joseph Maselli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zingg A Ulivi
Represented By: Conrad C Rolling
Represented By: Joseph Maselli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breal L Hillery
Represented By: Douglas D. McGinity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?