In Re: Christopher Martin Ridgeway
Appellant: Christopher Martin Ridgeway
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Stryker Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv07651
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by Christopher Martin Ridgeway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix, #2 Exhibit Volume I of Appendix, #3 Exhibit Volume II of Appendix, #4 Exhibit Volume III of Appendix, #5 Exhibit Volume IV of Appendix, #6 Exhibit Volume V of Appendix, #7 Exhibit Volume VI of Appendix)(Franco, Philip)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James B. Sowka. IT IS ORDERED that James B. Sowka is hereby GRANTED leave to participate pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendants Stryker Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice)(jls)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Admission of James B. Sowka to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James B. Sowka (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7119274) by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Admission/Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Nobles, Cherie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Appellant Brief due by 10/11/2018. Signed by the Clerk.(jls)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Designation of Record on Appeal, #5 Designation of Record on Appeal. **Clerk has added the actual designations of record (USBC docs. 692 and 704) to these entries. Clerk also modified docket text for #5 Designation of Record on Appeal to indicate it was filed by both Stryker Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. Clerk will resend NEF to all counsel.** (jls)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Stryker Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, and NOTICE of complete record received from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 12, #2 Part 2 of 12, #3 Part 3 of 12, #4 Part 4 of 12, #5 Part 5 of 12, #6 Part 6 of 12, #7 Part 7 of 12, #8 Part 8 of 12, #9 Part 9 of 12, #10 Part 10 of 12, #11 Part 11 of 12, #12 Part 12 of 12)(jls) Modified filers on 9/13/2018 (jls). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #13 Counter Designation of Record on Appeal) (jls).
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Christopher Martin Ridgeway re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, and NOTICE of complete record received from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 19, #2 Part 2 of 19, #3 Part 3 of 19, #4 Part 4 of 19, #5 Part 5 of 19, #6 Part 6 of 19, #7 Part 7 of 19, #8 Part 8 of 19, #9 Part 9 of 19, #10 Part 10 of 19, #11 Part 11 of 19, #12 Part 12 of 19, #13 Part 13 of 19, #14 Part 14 of 19, #15 Part 15 of 19, #16 Part 16 of 19, #17 Part 17 of 19, #18 Part 18 of 19, #19 Part 19 of 19)(jls) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #20 Statement of Issues and Notice of Designation of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal) (jls).
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cherie D. Nobles on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation. (Nobles, Cherie)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Manthey on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation. (Manthey, Tristan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Douglas D. Dodd. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Christopher Martin Ridgeway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J, #2 USBC Memorandum Opinion, #3 USBC Order, #4 USBC Docket Sheet, #5 USBC Transmittal Letter)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Christopher Martin Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christopher Martin Ridgeway
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Mary Sprague Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Represented By: Tristan Manthey
Represented By: Cherie D. Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Represented By: Tristan Manthey
Represented By: Cherie D. Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?