Hammond v. National Continental Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Esther Hammond
Defendant: Seahawk Transportation, LLC, Ivan N Kirsanov, Run Direct, Inc. and National Continental Insurance Company
Consolidated Plaintiff: Dorothy Hubbard and Erin Moran
Consolidated Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Ivan Kirsanov
Case Number: 2:2018cv07791
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Run Direct, Inc. served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Reference: 2:18-cv-07791)(Wild-Donde'Ville, Cheryl) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (jeg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 Request for Summons Issued, #21 Request for Summons Issued, #22 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 18-cv-7938)(jeg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Ivan N Kirsanov, Run Direct, Inc., Seahawk Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Reference: 18-cv-7938)(jeg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 23 Request of Summons Issued as to Seahawk Transportation, LLC filed by Erin Moran (Reference: 2:18-cv-07938)(Traylor, Ashley) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/28/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 27, 2018 Filing 22 Request of Summons Issued as to Run Direct, Inc. filed by Erin Moran (Reference: 2:18-cv-07938)(Traylor, Ashley) (Main Document 22 replaced on 9/28/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 Request of Summons Issued as to Ivan Kirsanov filed by Erin Moran(Reference: 2:18-cv-07938)(Traylor, Ashley) (Main Document 21 replaced on 9/28/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 27, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Run Direct, Inc. (Reference: 18-7791)(jeg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 Request of Summons Issued as to Run Direct, Inc. filed by Esther Hammond re #1 Notice of Removal. (Reference: 2:18-cv-07791)(Wild-Donde'Ville, Cheryl) Modified text on 9/27/2018 (jeg).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are HEREBY CONSOLIDATED. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereinafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be entered on the individual docket sheet. All documents shall befiled in the master file only, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be filed in the record of the individual case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/2018.(mmv)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by National Continental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Giordano, Charles)
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Samantha Nguyen of Petition for Damages served on Ivan Kirsanov on August 1, 2018. Answer due 8/22/2018. (Wild-Donde'Ville, Cheryl) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (jeg).
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Notice of Compliance. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should thedocument you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Compliance by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 9/5/2018 (jeg).
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Notice by Ivan N Kirsanov, National Continental Insurance Company for Notice (Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (jeg).
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ivan N Kirsanov, National Continental Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Ivan N Kirsanov, National Continental Insurance Company. Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party Ivan N Kirsanov(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (jeg).
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Seahawk Transportation, LLC. (jeg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Seahawk Transportation, LLC filed by Esther Hammond re #1 Notice of Removal. (Wild-Donde'Ville, Cheryl)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** AFFIDAVIT of Service by Samantha Nguyen of Petition for Damages served on Ivan Kirsanov on August 1, 2018. (Wild-Donde'Ville, Cheryl) Modified on 8/28/2018 (jeg).
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Continental Insurance Company. By the Clerk on 8/17/2018.(jeg)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is NOTICE. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, List of Documents included in State Court record. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles) Modified on 8/21/2018 (jeg).
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Consent to File Notice of Removal by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Giordano, Charles) Modified event on 8/17/2018 (jeg).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2018-2154 Div A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7063522) filed by National Continental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party National Continental Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/17/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 8/17/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. National Continental Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Hammond
Represented By: Clay Joseph Garside
Represented By: Cheryl L. Wild-Donde'Ville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seahawk Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan N Kirsanov
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jennifer Stierman Edwards
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Run Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Jennifer Stierman Edwards
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Represented By: Frank Allen Romeu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dorothy Hubbard
Represented By: Brad Rodney Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Erin Moran
Represented By: Ashley Anderson Traylor
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Anderson
Represented By: Gary N. Boutwell, II
Represented By: Courtney Papale Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ivan Kirsanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?