Eades et al v. Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeremy Eades and Courtney Alston
Defendant: Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv07832
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Calcasieu
0 Judge: Lance M Africk
1 Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 18-7832 and 18-7887 are consolidated with 18-7711. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2018.(blg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Stanga, Alonzo)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #19 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. ALSO, Notice of Submission not needed for the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate. Document marked 'Filed in Error.'** (sbs)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Submission. (Zelbst, John) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (sbs).
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Zelbst, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #3 Proposed Order) (sbs). Modified text on 9/19/2018 (sbs).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Lloyd Butler. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clay Rowe Zelbst. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chandra Lorraine Holmes. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Paul Zelbst. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Butler (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Butler, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified on 9/17/2018 (sbs).
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clay R. Zelbst (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Clay Zelbst, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs).
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chandra L. Holmes (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chandra L. Holmes, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs).
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John P. Zelbst (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John P. Zelbst, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs).
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Butler (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113197) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of David Butler, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs).
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clay Zelbst (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113180) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Clay Zelbst, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs).
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chandra L. Holmes (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113157) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Chandra L. Holmes, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs).
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Zelbst (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113101) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of John Zelbst, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #4 Attorney ECF Registration Form) (sbs). Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The captioned matter appears related to Civil Action 18-7711. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the matter be transferred to Section "I"(5) of this court, with concurrence of the Judge from the latter Section. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/28/2018.(jls)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (jls)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Main document replaced to correct case caption. (jls)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7064678) filed by Jeremy Eades, Courtney Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Service to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.)Attorney Alonzo T. Stanga, III added to party Courtney Alston(pty:pla), Attorney Alonzo T. Stanga, III added to party Jeremy Eades(pty:pla).(Stanga, Alonzo) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/17/2018) (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eades et al v. Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Autumn Taylor Breeden
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: James Grady Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Eades
Represented By: Alonzo T. Stanga, III
Represented By: John Paul Zelbst
Represented By: David Lloyd Butler
Represented By: Chandra Lorraine Holmes
Represented By: Clay Rowe Zelbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Alston
Represented By: Alonzo T. Stanga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?