Outlaw-Knight et al v. Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight and Galloway Outlaw-Knight
Defendant: Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv07887
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
0 Judge: Lance M Africk
1 Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 18-7832 and 18-7887 are consolidated with 18-7711. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2018.(blg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (sbs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Young, Timothy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (sbs)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. filed by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight re #1 Complaint. (Young, Timothy)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/27/2018.(clc)(NEF: SEC. F, SEC. I, MAG 4, MAG 5)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.. (am)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7067261) filed by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Galloway Outlaw-Knight(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw-Knight et al v. Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galloway Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: David J. Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Autumn Taylor Breeden
Represented By: James Grady Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?