Hubbard v. Kirsanov, et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hubbard
Defendant: Ivan N Kirsanov, National Continental Insurance Company., Run Direct, Inc. and National Continental Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv07924
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that 18-7791 is consolidated with 18-7938, 18-7791. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/2018.(mmv)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance by National Continental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Notice by National Continental Insurance Company. (Giordano, Charles) Modified on 8/28/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Continental Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by National Continental Insurance Company.(Giordano, Charles)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Continental Insurance Company. By the Clerk.(jeg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. and Progressive Company as a corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Continental Insurance Company identifying Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for National Continental Insurance Company; Progressive Company for National Continental Insurance Company. (Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/21/2018 (jeg).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2018-2241 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7068817) filed by National Continental Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Verification, #5 Consent to Filing Notice of Removal, #6 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party National Continental Insurance Company.(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/21/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 8/21/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Kirsanov, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan N Kirsanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Continental Insurance Company.
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Run Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Frank Allen Romeu, Jr.
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Represented By: Jennifer Stierman Edwards
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hubbard
Represented By: Brad Rodney Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?