People Speak, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: People Speak, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv07927
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 First Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Hite, John) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (sbs).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. be and hereby is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Defendant may re-urge its motion to dismiss in a timely fashion. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Amended Complaint - All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned (bwn)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by People Speak, LLC.(Galeas, Pedro) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/10/2018 with a text searchable version of the PDF document) (tsf).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff People Speak, LLC, is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Thursday, October 4, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff files an amended complaint in accordance with this order, the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., will be denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion - All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned (bwn)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Galeas, Pedro)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Hite, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance Listing Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1447(b) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #6 Order. (Hite, John)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer due 9/6/18. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/22/2018. (bwn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by the Clerk.(jeg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hite, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Hite, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 785-473 Div I (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7068954) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "1" State Court Pleadings)Attorney John William Hite, III added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:selreq).(Hite, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/21/2018) (jeg). Modified text on 8/21/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People Speak, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Represented By: James G. Albertine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Speak, LLC
Represented By: Pedro F. Galeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?