Plaintiff Doctor v. Hospital Service District No 3 et al

Plaintiff: Plaintiff Doctor
Defendant: Greg Stock, Hospital Service District No 3, The Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, The Board of Commissioners of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, The Credentials Committee of TRMC, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Board of Commissioners and Credentials Committee
Case Number: 2:2018cv07945
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Mary
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to set status conference by Plaintiff Doctor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riess, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents a defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/5/2018.(mmv) (NEF: J. Ashe, MJ Knowles, Case Mgr)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock; answer due 10/25/2018. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/4/148. (clc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Credentials Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Hospital Service District No 3(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Greg Stock(pty:dft).(Ralston, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Credentials Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Hospital Service District No 3(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Greg Stock(pty:dft).(Ralston, Christopher) Modified on 10/3/2018 (clc).
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Credentials Committee served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Greg Stock served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Board of Commissioners served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hospital Service District No 3 served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/10/2018.(ajn)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 Summons Submitted for Issuance. ***Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of all Summons requests. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format.Clerk has taken corrective action.*** (ajn)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ajn)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn).
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn).
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn).
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn).
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7070414) filed by Plaintiff Doctor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michael R.C. Riess added to party Plaintiff Doctor(pty:pla).(Riess, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff Doctor v. Hospital Service District No 3 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Stock
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Dowling Burke Stough
Represented By: Carl Edward Hellmers, III
Represented By: James P. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Service District No 3
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Dowling Burke Stough
Represented By: Carl Edward Hellmers, III
Represented By: James P. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Commissioners of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Credentials Committee of TRMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Dowling Burke Stough
Represented By: Carl Edward Hellmers, III
Represented By: James P. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Dowling Burke Stough
Represented By: Carl Edward Hellmers, III
Represented By: James P. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credentials Committee
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Dowling Burke Stough
Represented By: Carl Edward Hellmers, III
Represented By: James P. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff Doctor
Represented By: Michael R.C. Riess
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Henican
Represented By: Christopher H. Riviere
Represented By: Todd M. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?