Sonnier, et al v. Bickham, et al
Plaintiff: Walter J Blanchard, Jr, Gregory Sonnier and Mary Sonnier
Defendant: GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Robert Bickham, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and USAA Insurance
Case Number: 2:2018cv08290
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Robert Bickham, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company.Attorney Stephen R. Barry added to party Robert Bickham(pty:dft).(Barry, Stephen) Modified text on 9/12/2018 (jeg).
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company (Barry, Stephen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-04427 Div D Sec 12 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7092413) filed by GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Consent for Removal, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Listing of Attorneys and Parties, #6 Listing of Pleadings, #7 Verification)Attorney Stephen R. Barry added to party GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Barry, Stephen) Modified text on 8/31/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonnier, et al v. Bickham, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen R. Barry
Represented By: Kathleen Crowe Marksbury
Represented By: Daphne P. McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: James R. Nieset, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bickham
Represented By: Stephen R. Barry
Represented By: Kathleen Crowe Marksbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J Blanchard, Jr
Represented By: Brigette Marla Piattoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sonnier
Represented By: Brigette Marla Piattoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sonnier
Represented By: Brigette Marla Piattoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?