Steltz et al v. National Football League et al
Plaintiff: Lindsay Steltz and Craig Steltz
Defendant: NFL Properties, LLC and National Football League
Case Number: 2:2018cv08307
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Receipt of Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania (my)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. MDL case number is 2323. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(lag)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2323. (lag)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1- Pleadings filed by the parties in state court, #2 Exhibit No. 2- Returns on service of process filed in state court)(Lemaire, Justin)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to NFL Properties, LLC answer due 9/28/2018; National Football League answer due 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/7/2018. (mm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, - Complaint by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lemaire, Justin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. By the Clerk.(sbs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case(s) by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League of related case(s) 12-md-2323 (MDL); 18-cv-03303; 161644-15 (N.Y. Sup.). (Lemaire, Justin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-03585 "M-13" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7092983) filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party NFL Properties, LLC(pty:dft), National Football League(pty:dft).(Lemaire, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/4/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 9/4/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steltz et al v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Steltz
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Steltz
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties, LLC
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Represented By: Michael Q. Walshe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Represented By: Michael Q. Walshe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?