Reese, et al v. Great West Casualty Company, et al
Plaintiff: Markco Odds and Wilburt Reese
Defendant: Leroy Caldwell, Great West Casualty Company and Miller Transportation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08336
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Old Republic International Corporation as a corporate parent for Great West Casualty Company at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Additionally, filing attorney incorrectly named Great West Casualty Company as Corporate Parent for Great West Casualty Company and Miller Transportation Services, Inc. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Great West Casualty Company, Miller Transportation Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Great West Casualty Company. (Rabalais, David) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (jeg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Company, Miller Transportation Services, Inc. Attorney David R. Rabalais added to party Great West Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney David R. Rabalais added to party Miller Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rabalais, David) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (jeg).
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Great West Casualty Company served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Baer, Jason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Miller Transportation Services, Inc. served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Baer, Jason)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leroy Caldwell, Great West Casualty Company, Miller Transportation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jeg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7094155) filed by Wilburt Reese, Markco Odds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Jason M. Baer added to party Markco Odds(pty:pla), Attorney Jason M. Baer added to party Wilburt Reese(pty:pla).(Baer, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese, et al v. Great West Casualty Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markco Odds
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Joshua A Stein
Represented By: Vanessa Motta
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilburt Reese
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Joshua A Stein
Represented By: Vanessa Motta
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: David R. Rabalais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Rabalais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?