J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Hollywood Celebration Lounge LLC. et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Earline C. Foy, Hollywood Celebration Lounge LLC. d/b/a Hollywood Sports & Celebration Lounge and Hollywood Celebration Lounge, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv08387
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for party served. Hollywood Celebration Lounge, LLC served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. No further action is necessary.** (jeg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Earline C. Foy served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Berthelot, Ronnie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hollywood Celebration Lounge, LLC served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Berthelot, Ronnie) Modified dates on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Earline C. Foy, Hollywood Celebration Lounge. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (Berthelot, Ronnie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7097549) filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Ronnie J. Berthelot added to party J&J Sports Productions, Inc.(pty:pla).(Berthelot, Ronnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Hollywood Celebration Lounge LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earline C. Foy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Celebration Lounge LLC. d/b/a Hollywood Sports & Celebration Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Celebration Lounge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronnie J. Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?