Mongoya v. AET MCV BETA, LLC
Plaintiff: Mervy Lloyd Mongoya
Defendant: AET MCV BETA, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Richard J Dodson
Case Number: 2:2018cv08827
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AET MCV BETA, LLC(#18-8829) re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/14/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Resetting Submission Date on #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/14/18.(Reference: All Cases)(clc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by AET MCV BETA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading- Reply Memorandum)(Reference: All Cases)(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that both #11 , #14 Requests for oral argument are DENIED. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/9/2018.(Reference: All Cases)(clc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AET MCV BETA, LLC re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Reference: All Cases)(Kraatz, Arthur)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Richard J Dodson, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Reference: All Cases)(Kutcher, Robert) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (jeg).
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to AET MCV BETA, LLC by Mervy Lloyd Mongoya. (Reference: 18-8827)(Kutcher, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by AET MCV BETA, LLC regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Reference: All Cases)(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (jeg).
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AET MCV BETA, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (jeg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. ORDERED that Robert A. Kutcher, Nicole S. Tygier, and the law firm of Wagar Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP, Two Lakeway Center, Suite 900, 3850 North Causeway Boulevard, Metairie, Louisiana, 70002, are hereby designated and enrolled as counsel of record for plaintiffs, Mervy Lloyd Mongaya and Richard J. Dodson, and that Richard J. Dodson, Kenneth H. Hooks, III, Michael A. Colomb, Dodson & Hooks, APLC, Lee J. Amedee, III, and Gauthier & Amedee be and are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for plaintiffs, Mervy Lloyd Mongaya and Richard J. Dodson. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/23/18. (Reference: All Cases)(clc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Richard J Dodson, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-8827, 18-8828, 18-8829)(Kutcher, Robert) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (jeg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard J Dodson, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 18-8827, 18-8828, 18-8829)(Kutcher, Robert) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (jeg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert A. Kutcher and Nicole S. Tygier to be substituted in place of Richard J. Dodson, Michael A. Colomb, Kenneth H. Hooks, III and Lee J. Amedee, III by Richard J Dodson, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-8827, 18-8828, 18-8829)Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Richard J Dodson(pty:conpla), Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(pty:conpla).(Kutcher, Robert) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (jeg).
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Richard J Dodson(#18-8828), Richard J Dodson(#18-8829), Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(#18-8829), Mervy Lloyd Mongoya, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(#18-8828) regarding #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-8827, 18-8828, 18-8829)(Kutcher, Robert) Modified on 10/22/2018 (jeg).
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard J Dodson(#18-8828), Richard J Dodson(#18-8829), Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(#18-8829), Mervy Lloyd Mongoya, Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(#18-8828). Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 18-8827, 18-8828, 18-8829)Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Richard J Dodson(pty:conpla), Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Richard J Dodson(pty:conpla), Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(pty:conpla), Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(pty:pla), Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Mervy Lloyd Mongoya(pty:conpla).(Kutcher, Robert) Modified on 10/22/2018 (jeg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 3. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. No further action necessary. (Reference: All cases)(jeg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by AET MCV BETA, LLC re #1 NOTICE of Removal. (Reference: All Cases)(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 10/9/2018 (jeg).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER:ORDERED that Member Cases 18-8828, 18-8829 are consolidated with Master Case 18-8827. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case, together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation, and a specific notation as to which case the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/26/2018.(clc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AET MCV BETA, LLC. By the Clerk on 9/21/2018.(jeg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC; St. James Parish, case number 38913 Div B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7128351) filed by AET MCV BETA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 State Court Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Arthur Raymond Kraatz added to party AET MCV BETA, LLC(pty:dft).(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mongoya v. AET MCV BETA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mervy Lloyd Mongoya
Represented By: Michael A. Colomb
Represented By: Richard J. Dodson
Represented By: Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Represented By: Nicole S. Tygier
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AET MCV BETA, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard J Dodson
Represented By: Michael A. Colomb
Represented By: Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Represented By: Lee J. Amedee, III
Represented By: Nicole S. Tygier
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?