Martin et al v. Western Auto Supply Company

Plaintiff: Wendi Martin Bohanowski, Luke S. Martin, Jr., Stella B. Martin and Faron J. Martin
Defendant: Western Auto Sup Co and Western Auto Supply Company
Petitioner: Faron J Martin
Case Number: 2:2018cv08912
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
1 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven D. Rineberg. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Rineberg (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7228779) by Wendi Martin Bohanowski, Faron J. Martin, Luke S. Martin, Jr, Stella B. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Attorney Registration Form)(Swarr, Frank)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference. A telephone scheduling conference will be held on November 30, 2018 at 9:00 before the Case Manager, Kimberly County. Parties will call in using the phone number (866) 434-5269, access code 6914502. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/02/2018.(am)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference by Wendi Martin Bohanowski, Faron J. Martin, Luke S. Martin, Jr, Stella B. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swarr, Frank)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the toll free number provided. By Clerk.(ijg)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Western Auto Supply Company.(Franco, Jason)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/27/2018.(ajn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
September 26, 2018 Filing fee received from All Plaintiffs : $ 400 - Receipt #LAE052211 (gk)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, case number 183770 "D" (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 List of Attorneys and Parties) Attorney Jason P. Franco added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft).(Franco, Jason) Modified text on 9/27/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Western Auto Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi Martin Bohanowski
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: Amanda Jones Ballay
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke S. Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: Amanda Jones Ballay
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella B. Martin
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: Amanda Jones Ballay
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faron J. Martin
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: Amanda Jones Ballay
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Faron J Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Sup Co
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?