Varrecchio v. Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ms Kathleen Varrecchio and Kathleen Varrecchio
Defendant: Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc., Ms Susan Cart, Ms, Lisa Romback, Susan Cart and Lisa Romback
Case Number: 2:2018cv08915
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Monistere, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Susan Cart, Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc., Lisa Romback. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Monistere, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Susan Cart, Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc., Lisa Romback. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Monistere, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Friends Housing Alliance, II, Inc., Lisa Romback on 11/08/2018; by Kathleen Varrecchio. (Attachments: #1 Return on Subpoena)(Varrecchio, Dominic) Modified text on 11/16/2018 (mm).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants are hereby granted seven (7) additional days, through and including Thursday, November 15, 2018, to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/7/2018. (sa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **The document has the incorrect spelling of the Judge's name. Future pleadings should reflect Section H Judge Milazzo.** (mm)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Susan Cart, Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc., Lisa Romback. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Michael J. Monistere added to party Susan Cart(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Monistere added to party Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Monistere added to party Lisa Romback(pty:dft).(Monistere, Michael) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (mm).
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Status Conference held on 10/4/2018. It is Ordered that good cause has been shown that the Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until November 29, 2018. Further Ordered that a preliminary injunction hearing is SET for November 29, 2018 at 9:30a.m. Defendant's response to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by November 8, 2018. (ecm)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this temporary restraining order shall be issued immediately and that Plaintiffs shall immediately give notice to Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is SET for October 4, 2018 at 2:00p.m. in the chambers of the undersigned in order to select a date for hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order will expire in 14 days of this Order, unless extended by Order of this Court for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/27/2018.(sa)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Kathleen Varrecchio re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Rule 65 Certification of Filing Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Varrecchio, Dominic)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - In order for this Court to issue a temporary restraining order "without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney," Plaintiff's attorney must certify "in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required." Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1)(B). IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall remedy the aforementioned deficiency or show that Defendants or their counsel have received notice of this matter by September 27, 2018 at 8:30a.m. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/26/2018.(sa)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kathleen Varrecchio. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5 in globo, #9 Exhibit 5 in globo, #10 Exhibit 5 in globo, #11 Exhibit 5 in globo, #12 Exhibit 5 in globo, #13 Exhibit 5 in globo, #14 Exhibit 5 in globo)(sa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7136707) filed by Kathleen Varrecchio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Exhibit #1, #7 Exhibit #2, #8 Exhibit #3, #9 Exhibit #4, #10 Exhibit #5 in globo, #11 Exhibit #5 in globo, #12 Exhibit #5 in globo, #13 Exhibit #5 in globo, #14 Exhibit #5 in globo, #15 Exhibit #5 in globo, #16 Exhibit #5 in globo) Attorney Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio added to party Kathleen Varrecchio(pty:pla).(Varrecchio, Dominic) (Attachment 1 flattened & replaced on 9/26/2018) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varrecchio v. Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Alliance Housing II, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Monistere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Susan Cart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms, Lisa Romback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cart
Represented By: Michael J. Monistere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Romback
Represented By: Michael J. Monistere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Kathleen Varrecchio
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Varrecchio
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?