In re: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Interested Party: De'Marcus Thomas
Case Number: 2:2018cv09080
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. IT IS ORDERED that the November 30, 2018 filing date relative to the Appellants' Appeal Brief be and is hereby continued to December 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 11/27/2018. (sa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines to File Appeal Brief by De'Marcus Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vicknair, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 11/30/2018. (ajn)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Appellee Designation, #3 Appellee Designation List, #4 Appellant Supplemental Designation, #5 Appellant Supplemental Designation List, #6 Appellant Designation, #7 Appellant Designation List, #8 Proof of Claim No. 9, #9 P-478 Appellee Statement of Evidence, #10 P-477 Appellee Statement of Issues, #11 P-470 Appellant Supplemental Statement of Issues, #12 P-469 Appellant Statement of Issues, #13 P-468 Appellant Statement of Evidence)(ajn)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge JERRY A. BROWN. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 Order Confirming Plan)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Mary Sprague Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Theodore Haik, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: De'Marcus Thomas
Represented By: David Paul Vicknair
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?