Philpot v. Scene Entertainment, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot and Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Scene Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09085
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to Scene Entertainment, LLC by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Kalis, Sarah)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Entry of Default as to Scene Entertainment, LLC. Signed by Clerk. (gec)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Scene Entertainment, LLC by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Kalis, Sarah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/8/2018) (cg). Modified on 11/13/2018 (gec).
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Spiess of Complaint served on Shelly Downes on behalf of Asher Friend on 10/03/2018. (Kalis, Sarah) Modified on 11/7/2018 (cg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Scene Entertainment, LLC by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kalis, Sarah) Modified on 11/6/2018 (cg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Scene Entertainment, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Kalis, Sarah) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (cg).
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet or the summons. The pdf's should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scene Entertainment, LLC. (mm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Larry G Philpot (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7146378) filed by Larry G Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)Attorney Sarah Mae Kalis added to party Larry G Philpot(pty:pla).(Kalis, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: #8 AO 121 Form) (mm). Modified text on 10/2/2018 (mm). AO121 Form sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/2/2018) (mm). (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/2/2018) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Scene Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Represented By: Sarah Mae Kalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Sarah Mae Kalis
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scene Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?