Philpot v. New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot and Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv09087
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Submission)(Roy, Mary Ellen)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation answer due 11/29/2018. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/7/2018. (ajn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. ALSO, filing attorney incorrectly linked the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to clerk's correction (R. Doc. 4). Clerk removed link.** (sbs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (sbs).
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdfs of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdfs should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation. (sbs)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7146447) filed by Larry G Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) Attorney Sarah Mae Kalis added to party Larry G Philpot(pty:pla).(Kalis, Sarah) (Attachments 6-7 replaced on 10/1/2018) (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: #8 AO Form 121) (sbs). Modified text on 10/1/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: Sarah Mae Kalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: Sarah Mae Kalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Tourism Marketing Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Anne Viator
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?