North Oaks Medical Center, LLC v. Azar
Plaintiff: North Oaks Medical Center, LLC
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2018cv09088
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Michael Mulholland, III. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Adam Hodges. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
October 26, 2018 Filing fee paid from North Oaks Medical Center, LLC for Daniel Mulholland III re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (ess)
October 26, 2018 Filing fee paid for Joshua Hodges re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (ess)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Hodges, #7 Ex Parte MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Mulholland, III. **Documents do not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section E and Magistrate 1.** (sbs)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Mulholland, III (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by North Oaks Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (sbs).
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Hodges (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by North Oaks Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Registration Form)(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (sbs).
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (bwn)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint - All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned (bwn)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Philips, Harry)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7146679) filed by North Oaks Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Philips, Harry) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/4/2018 with a text searchable version of the pdf document) (tsf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Oaks Medical Center, LLC v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Oaks Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Adam Hodges
Represented By: Daniel Michael Mulholland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?