Jackson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Brandon Alexander, Jason Jackson, Charlene Fletcher, Caroline Jackson and Keshonthel Jackson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv09175
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan A. Ennis of Complaint for Damages served on Ford Motor Company on 11/26/2018. (Warshauer, Irving)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (am)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7152642) filed by Caroline Jackson, Brandon Alexander, Jason Jackson, Charlene Fletcher, Keshonthel Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Irving Jay Warshauer added to party Brandon Alexander(pty:pla), Charlene Fletcher(pty:pla), Caroline Jackson(pty:pla), Jason Jackson(pty:pla), Keshonthel Jackson(pty:pla).(Warshauer, Irving) Modified text on 10/4/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Alexander
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Paul Lawrence Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jackson
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Paul Lawrence Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Fletcher
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Paul Lawrence Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Jackson
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Paul Lawrence Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshonthel Jackson
Represented By: Irving Jay Warshauer
Represented By: Paul Lawrence Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?