Burdett v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Pamela Folse Burdett
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2018cv09352
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - A Preliminary Conference was held on 12/5/2018. Status Conference set for 1/23/2019 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 8/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 9/30/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Issued by Case Manager. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(sa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 Notice that the Preliminary Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dno)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dno)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Certificate of Counsel. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is NOTICE of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 3. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (jeg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE re #1 NOTICE of Removal by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition for Damages, #3 State Court Request for Notice)(McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (jeg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (McGlinchey, Deirdre)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. By the Clerk on 10/9/2018.(jeg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 786-495 Sec A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7158948) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)Attorney Deirdre Claire McGlinchey added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft).(McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified text on 10/9/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdett v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Folse Burdett
Represented By: Jason Rogers Williams
Represented By: Nicole E. Burdett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Colvin Gamble Norwood, Jr.
Represented By: Marshall Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?