Ton v. Ton
Plaintiff: Lynda Ronquillo Ton
Defendant: Hendrikus E. Ton and Hendrikus Ton
Case Number: 2:2018cv09353
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Refer Case to Bankruptcy Court (Rec. Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. Case transferred to United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/15/2018. (2 cc: USBC)(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Transmittal to Bankruptcy, #2 USDC Docket Sheet) (sa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #3 Bankruptcy Receipt 10-17-2018) (sa).
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case (Ex Parte Motion and Memorandum for Referral to Bankruptcy Court) by Lynda Ronquillo Ton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piper, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Amendment/Supplement to Document. Document should not have been filed separately. It should have been attached to record document 1 as an attachment. Clerk has taken corrective action.(mm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lynda Ronquillo Ton. By the Clerk. (mm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Filed Separately - See Rec. Doc. 1 - Amendment/Supplement to Document by Lynda Ronquillo Ton Relevant State Court Pleadings (Piper, Michael) Modified text on 10/9/2018 (mm).
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District Court, Plaquemines Parish, case number 60-00082-A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7158953) filed by Lynda Ronquillo Ton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading)Attorney Michael Hugh Piper added to party Lynda Ronquillo Ton(pty:pla).(Piper, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #3 State Court Documents) (mm). Modified text on 10/9/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ton v. Ton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Ronquillo Ton
Represented By: Michael Hugh Piper
Represented By: Lila Molaison Samuel
Represented By: George Read Coleman
Represented By: Scott Richards Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrikus E. Ton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrikus Ton
Represented By: David M. Prados
Represented By: Robert P. Early, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?