Bellow v. Cenlar FSB
Plaintiff: Kurt T Bellow, Jr.
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Case Number: 2:2018cv09401
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint as to Cenlar FSB answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/26/18. (ecm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint by Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Berthelot, Ronnie)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #5 Motion to Enroll Ronnie J. Berthelot as Counsel of Record for defendant, Cenlar FSB. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/21/2018. (ecm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Ronnie J. Berthelot by Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ronnie J. Berthelot added to party Cenlar FSB(pty:dft).(Berthelot, Ronnie) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (mm).
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued via USPS as to Cenlar FSB. (mm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Cenlar FSB (Filing Fee Previously Paid) filed by Kurt T Bellow, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/1/2018. (mm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Cenlar FSB (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Kurt T Bellow, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellow v. Cenlar FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Ronnie J. Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt T Bellow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?