Knight et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Michael D Knight, Debra Knight, Wayne A. Knight and Wayne J. Knight
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Standard Motor Products, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Underwriters At Lloyds London, Fairbanks Morse Pump Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Champion International Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, BASF Catalysts, LLC, AutoZone, Inc., Gould Pumps (IPG), Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Arconic, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, General Electric Company, Gould Electronics, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, 3M Company, Lincoln Electric Company, BWDAC, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company, Pellerin Milnor Corporation, J D Roberts, Special Shipping, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Dap, Inc., Special Electric Company, Inc., CP Chem Company, LLC, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Whitney Automotive Group, Inc, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., McCanna Corporation, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe, & Jack, Inc., Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Uniroyal Inc, TACO, Inc., BWIP Inc., Anco Insulations Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., The Sherwin - Williams Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., CBS Corporation, Mueller Co. LLC, Texaco, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Sherwin-Williams Company, BWDAC, Inc, BW/IP, Inc., Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Albert Bossier, CP Chem Company LLC, Flowserve US Inc, Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc., Claims Resolution Management Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, Advance Stores Company, Texaco Inc, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Albert L Bossier, Jr and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: John Crane Inc
Intervenor Defendant: Borg Warner Morse TEC LLC, Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Hexion, Inc., Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London, Crane Carrier Co, Certain-Teed Corporation and Carquest Auto Parts
Intervenor Plaintiff: Michael Knight and Debra Knight Houston
3Rd Party Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Interpleader: Eagle Inc.
Cross Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, Pep Boys- Manny,m Moe & Jack, Inc. and Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09421
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 367 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading)(deMahy, Adam) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (mm).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #360 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gould Electronics Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #359 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gould Electronics, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #357 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/27/2020. (ko)
March 26, 2020 Filing 362 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #361 Notice (Other). **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 361 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC Notice of Service of Expert Witness Disclosures. (Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 3/26/2020 (mm).
March 24, 2020 Filing 360 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Dismissal of Gould Electronics, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gould Electronics, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (mm).
March 23, 2020 Filing 359 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Dismissal of Gould Electronics, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gould Electronics, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (mm).
March 23, 2020 Filing 358 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #357 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #356 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
March 23, 2020 Filing 357 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. by Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lonegrass, Michael) Modified text/filers on 3/23/2020 (mm).
March 23, 2020 Filing 356 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. by Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Michael D. Lonegrass added to party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (pty:crd).(Lonegrass, Michael) Modified text/filer on 3/23/2020 (mm).
March 20, 2020 Filing 355 Witness List by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rand, Kenan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 354 Exhibit List by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rand, Kenan)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #350 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims asserted by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated against The Lincoln Electric Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/19/2020. (ko)
March 19, 2020 Filing 352 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #349 Exhibit List, #348 Witness List. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T, Judge Guidry. (cwa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 351 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #342 Exhibit List, #343 Witness List. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T, Judge Guidry. (cwa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 350 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party without Prejudice by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Kelly) Modified text on 3/19/2020 (cwa).
March 18, 2020 Filing 349 Exhibit List by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Napolitano, Shelley)
March 18, 2020 Filing 348 Witness List by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Napolitano, Shelley)
March 18, 2020 Filing 347 Witness List by BWDAC, Inc. (Harrison, William)
March 18, 2020 Filing 346 Exhibit List by BWDAC, Inc. (Harrison, William)
March 18, 2020 Filing 345 Exhibit List by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harrison, William)
March 18, 2020 Filing 344 Witness List by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Harrison, William)
March 18, 2020 Filing 343 Witness List by CBS Corporation((see doc. 11-6, page 8 of Albert L Bossier, Jr)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 342 Exhibit List by CBS Corporation((see doc. 11-6, page 8 of Albert L Bossier, Jr)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 341 Witness List by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 340 Exhibit List by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 339 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 338 Witness List by Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC. (Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 337 Exhibit List by Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC. (Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 336 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SFS USA Holding Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC (Puente-Martin, Magali)
March 18, 2020 Filing 335 Exhibit List by Texaco Inc. (Fuller, Melissa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 334 Witness List by Texaco Inc. (Fuller, Melissa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 333 Exhibit List by Trane US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bowlin, Angela)
March 18, 2020 Filing 332 Witness List by Trane US, Inc.. (Bowlin, Angela)
March 18, 2020 Filing 331 Exhibit List by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bowlin, Angela)
March 18, 2020 Filing 330 Witness List by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Bowlin, Angela)
March 18, 2020 Filing 329 Exhibit List by Mueller Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Bowlin, Angela)
March 18, 2020 Filing 328 Witness List by Mueller Co. LLC. (Bowlin, Angela)
March 17, 2020 Filing 327 ANSWER to #209 Amended Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Logan, James)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #323 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims asserted by Albert L. Boissier, Jr. against the Lincoln Electric Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/17/2020. (ko)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #322 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims asserted by Michael Knight and Debra Knight Houston against the Lincoln Electric Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/17/2020. (ko)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) finding as moot #285 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/17/2020. (tjg)
March 16, 2020 Filing 323 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Lincoln Electric Company Without Prejudice by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Kelly)
March 16, 2020 Filing 322 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Lincoln Electric Company by Debra Knight Houston, Michael Knight, Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Kelly)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Lincoln Electric Company dismissed. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/12/2020. (cwa)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #300 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party General Electric Company dismissed. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/12/2020. (cwa)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #299 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Special Electric Company, Inc. dismissed. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/12/2020. (cwa)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Amber B. Barlow for Pneumo Abex LLC. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/12/2020. (mm)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Amber B. Barlow for BWDAC, Inc. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/12/2020. (mm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 316 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #311 Initial Disclosures pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1). **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 315 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #310 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #309 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 314 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #305 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber Barlow. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
March 12, 2020 Filing 313 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Inc (Arthur, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ko) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)
March 12, 2020 Filing 311 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Initial Disclosures pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) by Whitney Automotive Group, Inc. (Kendall, Ian)
March 12, 2020 Filing 310 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (McQuillar, April)
March 12, 2020 Filing 309 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (McQuillar, April)
March 12, 2020 Filing 308 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #302 Notice (Other).**Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (pp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 307 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Lincoln Electric Company by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn)
March 12, 2020 Filing 306 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber Barlow by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barlow, Amber) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (mm).
March 12, 2020 Filing 305 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber Barlow by BWDAC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barlow, Amber) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (mm).
March 11, 2020 Filing 304 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London (Logan, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 303 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand Original, Amended, Second Amended, & Third Amended by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.Attorney James R Logan, IV added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft).(Logan, James) Modified text/link on 3/12/2020 (pp).
March 11, 2020 Filing 302 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Flowserve Corporation FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Thibodeaux, Brandie) Modified on 3/12/2020 (pp).
March 11, 2020 Filing 301 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #300 MOTION to Dismiss General Electric Company, #299 MOTION to Dismiss Special Electric Company, Inc.. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Jason Z. Landry and Jeremy J. Landry, for a party in this action who have not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. 2. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Party. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
March 10, 2020 Filing 300 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss General Electric Company by Debra Knight Houston, Michael Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Centola, Lawrence) Modified event on 3/11/2020 (mm).
March 10, 2020 Filing 299 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Special Electric Company, Inc. by Debra Knight Houston, Michael Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Centola, Lawrence) Modified event on 3/11/2020 (mm).
March 4, 2020 Filing 298 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #297 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 297 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 3/4/2020 (mm).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #295 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of intervenors against Armstrong Pumps, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/04/2020. (ko)
March 4, 2020 Filing 295 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Armstrong Pumps, Inc. by Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Michael Knight, Debra Knight Houston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkes, Forrest) Modified text on 3/4/2020 (mm).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #284 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against General Electric Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #282 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Georgia-Pacific, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #281 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Union Carbide Corporation are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #280 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Dow Chemical Company are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Armstrong Pumps, Inc. are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against DAP, Inc. are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #277 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #273 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of plaintiffs against Special Electric Company, Inc. are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/03/2020. (ko)
March 3, 2020 Filing 286 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lincoln Electric Company, Lincoln Electric Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26)(Long, Kelly)
March 3, 2020 Filing 285 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Deposition Testimony of Wayne Knight, Sr. by Lincoln Electric Company, Lincoln Electric Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 State Court Pleadings Exhibit A)Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party Lincoln Electric Company(pty:crd).(Long, Kelly)
March 3, 2020 Filing 284 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party General Electric by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., General Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified text/filers on 3/4/2020 (cwa).
March 2, 2020 Filing 283 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #282 MOTION to Dismiss Party Georgia-Pacific LLC, #278 MOTION to Dismiss Party DAP, Inc., #279 MOTION to Dismiss Party Armstrong Pumps, #281 MOTION to Dismiss Party Union Carbide Union Carbide Corporation, #280 MOTION to Dismiss Party Dow Chemical Company, #277 MOTION to Dismiss Party Industrial Holdings. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
March 2, 2020 Filing 282 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Georgia-Pacific LLC by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Georgia-Pacific LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
March 2, 2020 Filing 281 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Union Carbide Corporation by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Union Carbide Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
March 2, 2020 Filing 280 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Dow Chemical Company by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Dow Chemical Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
March 2, 2020 Filing 279 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Armstrong Pumps, Inc. by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
March 2, 2020 Filing 278 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party DAP, Inc. by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., DAP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
March 2, 2020 Filing 277 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Industrial Holdings by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr., Industrial Holdings Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified filers on 3/2/2020 (mm).
February 28, 2020 Filing 276 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #275 Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
February 28, 2020 Filing 275 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (mm).
February 27, 2020 Filing 274 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #273 MOTION to Dismiss Party Special Electric Company, Inc. **1. Filing attorney submitted incorrect proposed order. Corrected Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. 2. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
February 27, 2020 Filing 273 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Special Electric Company, Inc. by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Alex) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/27/2020) (mm).
February 27, 2020 Filing 272 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #271 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #270 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint, Answer to Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section letter and Magistrate Judge number. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate Judge (4).** (mm)
February 26, 2020 Filing 271 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings US LLC for Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Senter, Meghan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 270 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC.(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (mm).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiffs: ORDERED that plaintiffs move for entry of default on or before 03/12/2020, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why defendant, General Electric Company, should not be dismissed for plaintiffs' failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2020.(ko)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff's Counsel: On or before 03/12/2020, plaintiffs' counsel is instructed to file proof of service, or show good cause, in writing, why service of process has not been effected upon defendant Special Electric Company, Inc. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2020.(ko)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #264 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney McNeil James Kemmerly for AutoZone, Inc. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/20/2020. (ko)
February 19, 2020 Filing 266 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #265 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #263 Answer to Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 18, 2020 Filing 265 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele)
February 18, 2020 Filing 264 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record McNeil Kemmerly by AutoZone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeBouef, Lee)
February 18, 2020 Filing 263 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Bayer CropScience, Inc. Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Bayer CropScience, Inc.(pty:crd).(St. Julien, Milele)
February 18, 2020 Filing 262 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by AutoZone, Inc.(LeBouef, Lee)
February 18, 2020 Filing 261 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by BWDAC, Inc.(Harrison, William)
February 18, 2020 Filing 260 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Harrison, William)
February 18, 2020 Filing 259 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #255 Notice (Other), #256 Notice (Other), #254 Notice (Other), #251 Notice (Other), #249 Notice (Other), #250 Notice (Other), #252 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
February 18, 2020 Filing 258 ANSWER to #1 Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Mueller Co. LLC. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Mueller Co. LLC(pty:crd).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (mm).
February 18, 2020 Filing 257 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Mueller Co. LLC.(Bowlin, Angela)
February 17, 2020 Filing 256 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Wilkes, Forrest) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 255 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Industrial Holdings Corporation RULE 26(A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES. (Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 254 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by IMO Industries, Inc. RULE 26(A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES. (Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Proceedings by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapter 11 Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Temp Restraining Order)(Rossi, Alexandra) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 252 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by BWDAC, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harrison, William) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 251 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Pneumo Abex LLC Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Harrison, William) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 250 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Western Auto Supply Company Initial Disclosures. (Barlow, Amber) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 17, 2020 Filing 249 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** NOTICE by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne A Knight, Jr Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1). (Donahue, Roshawn) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (mm).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #243 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Amber B. Barlow for BWDAC, Inc, Pneumo Abex LLC. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/14/2020. (ko)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Whitney Charmaine Stewart for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/14/2020. (ko)
February 14, 2020 Filing 246 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #245 Notice (Other). **Document lists counsel of record, Amber B. Barlow, for CertainTeed Corporation in this action who has not been enrolled for this party. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel for Certainteed Corporation.** (mm)
February 14, 2020 Filing 245 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing, Stay of Proceedings, and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order by CertainTeed Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ormsby, Barbara)
February 14, 2020 Filing 244 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #243 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber B. Barlow. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 243 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record by BWDAC, Inc, Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Amber B. Barlow added to party BWDAC, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Amber B. Barlow added to party Pneumo Abex Corporation(pty:dft).(Barlow, Amber)
February 13, 2020 Filing 242 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
February 13, 2020 Filing 241 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Whitney C. Stewart by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellinghausen, Edwin)
February 12, 2020 Filing 240 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #239 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Whitney C. Stewart, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel.** (mm)
February 12, 2020 Filing 239 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (mm).
February 11, 2020 Filing 238 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #236 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint, #237 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Roth M. Hainkel, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel.** (mm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 237 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Trane US, Inc.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (mm).
February 11, 2020 Filing 236 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (mm).
February 7, 2020 Filing 235 EXCEPTIONS and ANSWER to #11 Huntington Ingalls Inc.'s Cross-Claims by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.((see doc. 11-6, page 8 of Albert L Bossier, Jr)).(Elam, Jason) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mm).
February 7, 2020 Filing 234 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #233 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document contains incorrect Section letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 7, 2020 Filing 233 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.(Elam, Jason)
February 7, 2020 Filing 232 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #231 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Georgia N. Ainsworth, who has not been enrolled in this matter for BASF Catalysts, LLC. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel.** (mm)
February 7, 2020 Filing 231 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BASF Catalysts, LLC.(Rossi, Alexandra)
February 7, 2020 Filing 230 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Lamorak Insurance Company.(deMahy, Adam) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 229 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 228 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc(Solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., McCanna Corporation, and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.).(Strain, Stacey) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 227 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #225 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document contains incorrect Section letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 226 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Western Auto Supply Company.(Barlow, Amber)
February 6, 2020 Filing 225 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Texaco Inc.(Fuller, Melissa)
February 6, 2020 Filing 224 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #223 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 223 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Honeywell International, Inc.(Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
February 5, 2020 Filing 222 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Albert L Bossier, Jr.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 2/5/2020 (mm).
February 4, 2020 Filing 221 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Whitney Automotive Group, Inc.(Kendall, Ian)
February 3, 2020 Filing 220 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #217 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint, #218 Answer to Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 3, 2020 Filing 219 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(Lightfoot, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Filing 218 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Viking Pump, Inc.(Matherne, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 217 ANSWER to #209 Fourth Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Flowserve Corporation(named in petition as Flowserve US, Inc. as Sussessor-In-Interest to Duramettallic Corporation).(Matherne, James)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Kevin Shockey terminated. FURTHER ORDERED that #210 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is denied as moot. In future, the withdrawing attorney's signature line should be separate. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/30/2020. (ko)
January 30, 2020 Filing 215 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #213 MOTION to Withdraw Patrick Kevin Shockey as Attorney. **Document has been accepted by chambers.** (mm)
January 29, 2020 Filing 214 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #213 MOTION to Withdraw Patrick Kevin Shockey as Attorney. **This is a duplicate filing of document 210 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
January 29, 2020 Filing 213 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Patrick Kevin Shockey as Attorney by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grace, Christopher) Modified text on 1/29/2020 (mm).
January 28, 2020 Filing 212 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lincoln Electric Company (Long, Kelly)
January 28, 2020 Filing 211 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #210 MOTION to Withdraw Patrick K. Shockey as Attorney. **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 3. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. ** (mm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 210 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Patrick K. Shockey as Attorney by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grace, Christopher) Modified text/removed referral & submission date on 1/28/2020 (mm).
January 24, 2020 Filing 209 FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Wayne A Knight, Jr, Jennifer E. Knight.(mp)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #200 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp)
January 24, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Amber B. Barlow for Western Auto Supply Company. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/21/2020. (ko)
January 17, 2020 Filing 205 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #204 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (mm)
January 17, 2020 Filing 204 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Albert L Bossier, Jr (Powell, Michael) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (mm).
January 17, 2020 Filing 203 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #202 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber B. Barlow. **Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
January 17, 2020 Filing 202 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Amber B. Barlow by Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Amber B. Barlow added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft).(Barlow, Amber) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (mm).
November 18, 2019 Filing 201 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #200 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Melancon, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne J. Knight. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Opposition, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Dunn, Alex)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER CANCELLING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: It has come to the Courts attention that not all parties have made an appearance in the above entitled case. Therefore, the scheduling conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to be reset after all parties have made an appearance and/or are represented by counsel. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/16/2019.(mm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 198 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand plc for Trane US, Inc. (Bowlin, Angela)
October 14, 2019 Filing 197 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company (Bowlin, Angela)
October 14, 2019 Filing 196 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mueller Co. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mueller Water Products, Inc. for Mueller Co. LLC (Bowlin, Angela)
October 1, 2019 Filing 195 Scheduling Conference Notice - A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, OCTOBER 17, 2019, at 10:00 A.M., for purposes of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. At the designated time, counsel are asked to call (877) 873-8018; when prompted enter Access Code: 8235682 to join a conference call with the Section Case Manager. Issued by Case Manager. (sa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 194 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Lacey Sarver Goss and Katelyn Harrell as Attorney for Defendant John Crane Inc. by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (mm).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rhonda Goode Douglas terminated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/13/2019. (mm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 192 ANSWER to #169 Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:intvd).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (mm).
July 23, 2019 Filing 191 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #190 MOTION to Withdraw. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 190 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Rhonda J. Goode-Douglas as Attorney by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellinghausen, Edwin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 189 ANSWER to #169 Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by AutoZone, Inc. (LeBouef, Lee) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (mm).
July 15, 2019 Filing 188 ANSWER to #169 Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Huntington Ingalls, Inc.(Shockey, Patrick) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (mm).
July 15, 2019 Filing 187 ANSWER to #169 Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Albert L Bossier, Jr .(Melancon, David) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (mm).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING #183 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ian Zachary Kendall. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 185 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #184 Answer to Intervenor Complaint; Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T. (blg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 184 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor Complaint by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Elam, Jason)
July 8, 2019 Filing fee paid for Ian Kendall re #183 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100) (ess)
July 8, 2019 Filing 183 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ian Z. Kendall (Filing fee $ 100) by Whitney Automotive Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificates of Good Standing, #4 ECF Form)(mm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 182 ANSWER to #169 Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Texaco Inc.(Gaudin, Chelsea) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (mm).
July 1, 2019 Filing 181 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor Complaint by Whitney Automotive Group, Inc.(Barnes, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 180 ANSWER to #169 Complaint for Intervention and Intervenors' First Supplemental and Amended Petition by Western Auto Supply Company. Attorney Jason P. Franco added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:intvd).(Franco, Jason) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (mm).
July 1, 2019 Filing 179 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Western Auto Supply Company served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Centola, Lawrence)
June 28, 2019 Filing 178 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Lamorak Insurance Company.(deMahy, Adam) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (am).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/27/2019.(am) (Main Document 177 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lag).
June 27, 2019 Filing 176 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Viking Pump, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (am).
June 27, 2019 Filing 175 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Flowserve Corporation.Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Flowserve Corporation(pty:intvd).(Matherne, James) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (am).
June 27, 2019 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Western Auto Supply Company served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Doody, Spencer) Modified text/answer due date/party served on 6/27/2019 (mm).
June 26, 2019 Filing 173 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 172 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc. Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Flowserve US Inc(pty:intvd).(Strain, Stacey) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 171 ANSWER to #169 Intervenor First Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BASF Catalysts, LLC.(Benoit, Allison) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (am).
June 17, 2019 Filing 170 Summons Issued as to Western Auto Supply Company. (am)
June 17, 2019 Filing 169 INTERVENORS' FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael Knight, Debra Knight Houston. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING #165 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 06/12/2019. (am)
June 12, 2019 Filing 167 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #164 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.**Document marked as Filed in Error, please see rec. doc. 165 for corrected filing.** (am)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE, as set forth in document. Case transferred back to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/11/2019.(jls)
June 12, 2019 Filing 165 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Debra Knight, Michael Knight. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Consent, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Summons)(Doody, Spencer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 164 **FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 165**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Debra Knight, Michael Knight. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Consent, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Spencer R. Doody added to party Debra Knight(pty:intvp).(Doody, Spencer) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (am).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING #161 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley Lynette Page terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2019. (jeg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(jls)
June 3, 2019 Filing 161 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Ashley Page as Attorney by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne J. Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Roshawn H. Donahue added to party Wayne A. Knight(pty:pla), Attorney Roshawn H. Donahue added to party Wayne A Knight, Jr(pty:pla).(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (am). Modified filers/atty association on 6/6/2019 (jls).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the #33 motion to sever and remand is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS ORDERED that the #36 motion to remand or for abstention is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/30/2019. (am)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #9 motion to dismiss intervention is DISMISSED AS MOOT, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/30/2019. (am)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING #155 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney David Wayne O'Quinn for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/29/2019. (am)
May 29, 2019 Filing 157 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #155 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record David W. O'Quinn. **Filing attorney incorrectly selected additional filer(s). Correct filer is Huntington Ingalls Incorporated only. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
May 29, 2019 Filing 156 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #154 Notice of Appearance.**Document has been stricken. Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. Motion to Enroll should be filed with a Proposed Order.** (am)
May 29, 2019 Filing 155 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record David W. O'Quinn by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text/filers on 5/29/2019 (jls).
May 28, 2019 Filing 154 **STRICKEN**NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Melancon on behalf of Albert L Bossier, Jr, Albert Bossier, Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls, Inc.. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (am).
May 23, 2019 Filing 153 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane Inc identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc (Rand, Kenan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 152 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 151 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Franco, Jason) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 150 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by John Crane Inc. (Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 149 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental and Amended Petition by John Crane Inc.(Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 148 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental and Amended Petition by John Crane Inc.(Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 147 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages by John Crane Inc.(Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 146 Post Call Docket Report Noting Answers by Jennifer E. Knight, Michael Knight to #110 Minute Entry, (Centola, Lawrence) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 145 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #142 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter National Amusements, Inc. and GAMCO Investors, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
May 16, 2019 Filing 144 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #139 Notice of Compliance.**Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 79.** (am)
May 16, 2019 Filing 143 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #133 , #136 Notice of Compliance. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 79.** (am)
May 16, 2019 Filing 142 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation. (Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified text/corporate parents on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 16, 2019 Filing 141 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by CBS Corporation.(Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 140 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by CertainTeed Corporation. (Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 139 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by Gould Electronics, Inc. Attorney Derek Robert Cusick added to party Gould Electronics, Inc.(pty:crd).(Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 138 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by BWDAC, Inc. (Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 137 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CertainTeed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Wendel Group, Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain for CertainTeed Corporation (Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 136 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by McCarty Corporation. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 135 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Culotta, Janice)
May 15, 2019 Filing 134 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental Amended Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by McCarty Corporation. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 133 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 15, 2019 Filing 132 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice)
May 15, 2019 Filing 131 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental Amended Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (am).
May 13, 2019 Filing 130 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #126 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section B.** (am)
May 13, 2019 Filing 129 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #124 , #125 Answers to Complaint.**1. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. **2. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section B.**. (am)
May 13, 2019 Filing 128 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #123 Claim.** 1.Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Answer to Complaint. Clerk took corrective action by changing the text. **2. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 66. **3. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section B.** (am)
May 10, 2019 Filing 127 Notice of Compliance by CertainTeed Corporation re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (am).
May 10, 2019 Filing 126 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by AutoZone, Inc. (LeBouef, Lee)
May 10, 2019 Filing 125 ANSWER #1 Notice of Removal, Second and Third Amended Petitions by AutoZone, Inc. (LeBouef, Lee) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (am).
May 10, 2019 Filing 124 ANSWER #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by AutoZone, Inc. (LeBouef, Lee) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (am).
May 10, 2019 Filing 123 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental Amended Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by AutoZone, Inc. (LeBouef, Lee) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (am). Modified on 5/15/2019 (am).
May 9, 2019 Filing 122 Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying Corporate Parent Armstrong Fluid Technology for Armstrong Pumps, Inc. by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Elam, Jason) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 121 Notice of Compliance by Pneumo Abex Corporation re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #95 motion is GRANTED. Defendant Albert L. Bossier, Jr.'s #11 Notice of 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Compliance is hereby SUPPLEMENTED with pleadings to be identified as Exhibit 33. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/06/2019. (am)
May 7, 2019 Filing 119 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Cross Claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by BWDAC, Inc.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING #90 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. All claims of Petitioners-in-Intervention Michael Knight and Debra Knight Houston, against Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties for a reasonable period of time. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/06/2019. (am)
May 7, 2019 Filing 117 ANSWER to #66 Cross claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 116 ANSWER to #66 Cross claims of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 115 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 114 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Third Amended Petition for Damages by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 113 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition for Damages by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 112 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, First Amended Petition for Damages by CertainTeed Corporation.(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (am).
May 3, 2019 Filing 111 Notice of Compliance by International Paper Company re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (am).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Call docket held by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/1/2019. Order Issued. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/1/2019.(mmm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle: Docket Call held on 5/1/2019. ORDERED: Counsel for the parties review the recently filed supplements to the Notice of Compliance, attachment to R. Doc. 95 and R. Docs. 98, 101, 102 and 105. FURTHER ORDERED: Counsel file a joint report noting which defendants have answered by May 16, 2019, as set forth in document. Counsel may file any replies to the aforementioned report by May 22, 2019. (mmm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 108 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Texaco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Texaco Inc. (Gaudin, Chelsea) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (am).
May 1, 2019 Filing 107 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #94 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal.**Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section "B".** (am)
May 1, 2019 Filing 106 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #91 , #92 Answers to Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (am)
April 30, 2019 Filing 105 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Elam, Jason) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am). .
April 30, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Intervention by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Elam, Jason) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am). (Main Document 104 replaced on 5/16/2019) (jls).
April 30, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiffs' Second and Third Supplemental And Amended Petition for Damages by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. Attorney Jason K. Elam added to party Armstrong Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft).(Elam, Jason) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. by BWDAC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Answer to Cross Claims, #3 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit BWDAC, Inc.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Petition)Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party BWDAC, Inc(pty:intvd), Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party BWDAC, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party BWDAC, Inc(pty:crd).(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Compliance re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Answer to Cross Claims, #3 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit Pneumo Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Petition)Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party Pneumo Abex LLC(pty:crd).(Harrison, William) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am)
April 30, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, of Eagle, Inc. to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages, Second Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages, and Third Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Cross Claim of Albert Bossier, Jr. by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Compliance to #79 Order: Court's Call Docket by Honeywell International, Inc. (Adams, Glenn) Modified on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 97 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer of Third Party Defendant to Petition for Intervention by McCarty Corporation. Attorney Janice M. Culotta added to party McCarty Corporation(pty:3pd).(Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Intervention by Eagle, Inc. Attorney Janice M. Culotta added to party Eagle, Inc.(pty:dft).(Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 95 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Supplement Notice of Compliance (R. Doc. 11) by Albert Bossier, Albert Bossier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 33)(Melancon, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Intervention by Texaco Inc. (Gaudin, Chelsea) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand (Answer to Plaintiffs' Second and Third Supplemental and Amending Petitions) by Texaco Inc. Attorney Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin added to party Texaco Inc.(pty:dft).(Gaudin, Chelsea) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Amended Petition for Damages, Second Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damanages and Third Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by Travelers Indemnity Company.Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:intvd).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Filing 90 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Rockwell Automation, Inc, Michael Knight, Debra Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard P. Sulzer added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:intvd).(Sulzer, Richard) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #87 motion is GRANTED, and Katelyn W. Harrell is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant John Crane Inc. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/25/2019. (am)
April 25, 2019 Filing 88 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #84 , #85 , #86 Answers to Complaint.**1. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section "B". ** 2. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.**. (am)
April 24, 2019 Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw from case Katelyn W. Harrell by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrell, Katelyn) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).
April 24, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental Amended Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by Honeywell International, Inc. (Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).
April 24, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by Honeywell International, Inc. (Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).
April 24, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Second Supplemental and Amended Petition and Third Supplemental and Amended Petition by Honeywell International, Inc.(Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).
April 24, 2019 Filing 83 Notice of Compliance by Lamorak Insurance Company re #79 Order: Court's Call Docket. (deMahy, Adam) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).
April 17, 2019 Filing 82 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #81 Answer to Notice of Removal, Intervenors Michael Knight and Debra Knight Houston's Petition for Intervention. **Pleading filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jls)
April 16, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Intervenors Michael Knight and Debra Knight Houston's Petition for Intervention, with Jury Demand by BASF Catalysts, LLC(incorrectly sued as BASF Catalysts LLC individually and as Successor to Bondo).(Rossi, Alexandra) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (jls). (Main Document 81 replaced on 4/17/2019) (jls).
April 16, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Second and Third Supplemental and Amended Petitions, with Jury Demand, by BASF Catalysts, LLC(incorrectly sued as BASF Catalysts LLC individually and as Successor to Bondo).(Rossi, Alexandra) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (jls).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Call Docket set for 5/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/15/2019.(am)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #76 Motion for Partial Dismissal of Cross-Claim Without Prejudice. All claims by Defendant/Cross-Claim Plaintiff, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated against Cross-Claim Defendant 3M Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties for a reasonable period of time. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/12/2019. (jls)
February 12, 2019 Filing 77 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Party Huntington Ingalls' Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Cross-Claim Defendant Without Prejudice 3M .**Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary.** (am)
February 11, 2019 Filing 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Cross-Claim Without Prejudice against 3M by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Shockey, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (am). (Main Document 76 replaced on 2/12/2019) (am). Modified text on 2/12/2019 (am).
January 16, 2019 Filing 75 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. for Industrial Holdings Corporation (Napolitano, Shelley)
January 16, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, 2nd & 3rd Supplemental and Amended Petition by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (am).
January 16, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by Industrial Holdings Corporation.Attorney Shelley K. Napolitano added to party Industrial Holdings Corporation(pty:intvd).(Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (am).
January 3, 2019 Filing 72 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #71 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Please disregard filing - document was filed in error. There are no summons forms attached.** (jls)
January 3, 2019 Filing 71 **FILED IN ERROR** Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Shockey, Patrick) Modified on 1/3/2019 (jls). (Main Document 71 replaced on 1/3/2019) (jls). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/3/2019) (jls).
December 27, 2018 Filing 70 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental and Amended Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 12/28/2018 (am).
December 21, 2018 Filing 69 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #68 Answer to First Supplemental and Amended Cross-Claims, #67 Answer to First Supplemental and Amended Cross-Claims. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section B.** (mm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 68 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental and Amended Cross-Claims by Viking Pump, Inc. (Matherne, James) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mm).
December 20, 2018 Filing 67 ANSWER to #66 First Supplemental and Amended Cross-Claims by Flowserve Corporation.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' 2nd and 3rd Supplemental and Amended Petitions for Damages re #1 Notice of Removal, and First Supplemental and Amended CROSSCLAIM adding Western Auto Supply Company by Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.Attorney Patrick Kevin Shockey added to party Huntington Ingalls, Inc.(pty:intvd).(Shockey, Patrick) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (jls).
December 14, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #33 MOTION to Sever Claims and Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(am)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/14/2018. (am)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Hexion, Inc. dismissed without prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/14/2018. (am)
December 12, 2018 Filing 62 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #60 MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Party. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (am)
December 11, 2018 Filing 61 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Albert Bossier, Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier(pty:intvd).(Melancon, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION of Partial Dismissal without Prejudice by Debra Knight, Jennifer E. Knight, Michael Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Debra Knight(pty:intvp), Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Jennifer E. Knight(pty:pla).(Centola, Lawrence) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (am).
December 7, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #36 MOTION to Remand or, in the Alternative, for Abstention. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(jls)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #56 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/6/2018. (jls)
November 30, 2018 Filing 57 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages .**Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 29, 2018 Filing 56 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier(pty:intvd).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (am).
November 27, 2018 Filing 55 **DEFICIENT**RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert Bossier, Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company re #36 MOTION to Remand or, in the Alternative, for Abstention . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 11/28/2018 (am).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #52 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Brendan Connick is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant Honeywell International. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/26/2018. (jls)
November 23, 2018 Filing 53 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #52 MOTION to Withdraw 35456 as Attorney . **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 3. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section B and Magistrate 4.** (mm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brendan P. Connick by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Glenn) Modified text on 11/23/2018 (mm).
November 16, 2018 Filing 51 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Whitney Automotive Group, Inc, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc identifying Corporate Parent U S Auto Parts Network Inc for Whitney Automotive Group, Inc, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc (Barnes, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 50 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #36 MOTION to Remand or, in the Alternative, for Abstention.****Filing attorney should have entered Submission Date and selected the correct hearing Judge. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 12/5/2018 before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. No further action is necessary. ** (am)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #34 request is DENIED. If it later appears to the Court that oral argument would be helpful on the underlying #33 motion to remand, it will be ordered. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/14/2018.(jls)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #38 request is DENIED. If it later appears to the Court that oral argument would be helpful on the underlying #36 motion to remand, it will be ordered. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/14/2018.(jls)
November 13, 2018 Filing 47 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claims Settlement Trust as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 46 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc.as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 45 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter BorgWarner Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #37 Notice (Other).**Notice of Submission should be filed as an attachment to the Motion instead of a separate docket entry. Clerk took corrective action by adding this document to the Motion.** (am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Shockey, Patrick) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 13, 2018 Filing 42 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court .**Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Motions that are set for hearing are not Exparte. Clerk has removed 'Exparte'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 12/19/2018 before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle . No further action is necessary. ** (am) Modified on 11/16/2018 (am).
November 13, 2018 Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC identifying Corporate Parent BorgWarner Inc. (Hays, Bradley) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 12, 2018 Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pneumo Abex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claims Settlement Trust for Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Harrison, William) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Filing 38 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Debra Knight, Michael Knight regarding #36 MOTION to Remand . (Doody, Spencer)
November 9, 2018 Filing 37 **FILED IN ERROR AS SEPARATE ENTRY**NOTICE by Debra Knight, Michael Knight re #36 MOTION to Remand Notice of Submission. (Doody, Spencer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Remand or, in the Alternative, for Abstention by Michael Knight, Debra Knight Houston. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)Attorney Spencer R. Doody added to party Debra Knight(pty:intvp).(Doody, Spencer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #7 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) (am). Modified text on 11/16/2018 (am). Modified text on 11/16/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. All claims and actions by Plaintiffs against Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/9/2018. (jls)
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jennifer E. Knight and Wayne J. Knight regarding #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Dunn, Alex) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Sever Claims and Remand to State Court by Jennifer E. Knight, Wayne J. Knight. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Dunn, Alex) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (am). Modified text on 11/16/2018 (am). Modified text on 11/16/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Filing 32 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #30 Notice (Other.**Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (am)
November 8, 2018 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Emmett, Robert) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (am).
November 8, 2018 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Flowserve Corporation (Thibodeaux, Brandie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 28 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Hexion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Dwight C. Paulsen, III added to party Hexion, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Paulsen, Dwight) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (am).
November 8, 2018 Filing 27 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BWDAC, Inc identifying DCo LLC as a corporate parent for BWDAC, Inc. (Harrison, William) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (am).
November 6, 2018 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Honeywell International, Inc. (Adams, Glenn)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party without Prejudice Defendant-in-Intervention Goulds Pumps LLC against Petitioners-in-Intervention by Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc., Michael Knight, Debra Knight Houston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCulloch, Lauren) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (am).
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gould Electronics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JX Holdings, Inc., JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation for Gould Electronics, Inc. (Cusick, Derek) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (am).
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter Advance Stores Company, Incorporatedas a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice. All claims and actions by Plaintiffs against Defendant BW/IP, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party bears its own costs and attorney fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/2/2018. (jls)
November 2, 2018 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Western Auto Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for Western Auto Supply Company (Franco, Jason) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (am).
November 1, 2018 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Arthur, Mary)
November 1, 2018 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal.**Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section "B" and Magistrate (4).** (am)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Intervention by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (am).
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party BW/IP, Inc. by Michael Knight, Debra Knight Houston, BW/IP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux added to party BW/IP, Inc.(pty:dft).(Thibodeaux, Brandie) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (am).
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BASF Catalysts, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BASF Catalysts Holding LLC, BASF DE for BASF Catalysts, LLC (Rossi, Alexandra) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (am).
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Jalenak, Jay)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Petition for Intervention by Viking Pump, Inc..Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Viking Pump, Inc.(pty:dft).(Matherne, James) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (am).
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Intervention by Flowserve Corporation.Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Flowserve Corporation(pty:dft).(Matherne, James) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (am).
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance by Albert Bossier re #1 NOTICE of REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Pleadings, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 State Court Pleadings, #8 State Court Pleadings, #9 State Court Pleadings, #10 State Court Pleadings, #11 State Court Pleadings, #12 State Court Pleadings, #13 State Court Pleadings, #14 State Court Pleadings, #15 State Court Pleadings, #16 State Court Pleadings, #17 State Court Pleadings, #18 State Court Pleadings, #19 State Court Pleadings, #20 State Court Pleadings, #21 State Court Pleadings, #22 State Court Pleadings, #23 State Court Pleadings, #24 State Court Pleadings, #25 State Court Pleadings, #26 State Court Pleadings, #27 State Court Pleadings, #28 State Court Pleadings, #29 State Court Pleadings, #30 State Court Pleadings, #31 State Court Pleadings, #32 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) Modified linkage on 10/26/2018 (jeg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal to Petition for Intervention by Flowserve US Inc.Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Flowserve US Inc(pty:dft).(Strain, Stacey) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (jeg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Intervention for Failure to State a Claim by Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch added to party Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.(pty:dft).(McCulloch, Lauren) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (am).
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Flowserve US Inc identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc (Strain, Stacey)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/12/2018.(blg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Albert Bossier, Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk.(sbs)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Melancon, David)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2017-3008 "J-5" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7165239) filed by Albert Bossier, Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit) Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier.(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (sbs). (Attachments 1, 6-13 replaced on 10/11/2018) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Quinn Kelcie Brown
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Vikram S. Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters At Lloyds London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Morse Pump Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Katie Dampier Chabert
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Anthony John Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Catalysts, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Craig Michael Cousins
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Quinn Kelcie Brown
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arconic, Inc.
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Rhonda Goode Douglas
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Jasmine Najee Brown
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Shockey
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Robert Cusick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pellerin Milnor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Shipping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lee Cromartie
Represented By: Glenn B. Adams
Represented By: Matthew Edward Simmons
Represented By: Leandro Ryan Area
Represented By: Brendan Connick
Represented By: Corey D. Moll
Represented By: Brendan P Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Stephen Jared Austin
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Represented By: Martin James Dempsey, Jr.
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Margaret Adams Casey
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Ashley A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CP Chem Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Travis Layne Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group, Inc
Represented By: Michael R. Barnes
Represented By: Ian Zachary Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Lonegrass
Represented By: Rodger Gregory Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCanna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe, & Jack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Represented By: Aleta W. Barnes
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWIP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin - Williams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Robert Edward Williams, IV
Represented By: Richard P. Sulzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Co. LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Dwight C. Paulsen, III
Represented By: David Edmund Redmann, Jr.
Represented By: David J. Topping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, Inc
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Adam D Whitworth
Represented By: David R. Frohn
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: James R. Logan, IV
Represented By: James R Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bossier
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Frances M. Montegut
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CP Chem Company LLC
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Represented By: Gregory E. Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: James R Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Frances M. Montegut
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer E. Knight
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Represented By: Ashley Lynette Page
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A Knight, Jr.
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A. Knight
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Knight
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Lauren B. Dietzen
Represented By: Kenan Slade Rand, Jr
Represented By: Lacey Sarver Goss
Represented By: Katelyn W. Harrell
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Represented By: Meredith R. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Borg Warner Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Huntington Ingalls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Hexion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Crane Carrier Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Carquest Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Knight
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Debra Knight Houston
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Eagle Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pep Boys- Manny,m Moe & Jack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?