Gordon v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Dale Wayne Gordon and Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr.
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway and Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv09463
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kansas City Southern Railway Company.(Talley, Patrick)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and Kansas City Southern Railway Company is granted an extension of time up to and including 11/28/2018 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/5/2018. (sa)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick A. Talley, Jr added to party Kansas City Southern Railway Company(pty:dft).(Talley, Patrick)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kansas City Southern Railway Company served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Granger, Benjamin) Modified text/answer date on 10/25/2018 (mm).
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Granger, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mm).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc A. Zito, for plaintiff Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marc A. Zito (Fee previously paid) by Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 CMEFC Form)(Granger, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (mm).
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7177181) by Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order, #4 CMEFC Form)(Granger, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/18/2018 (mm).
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Document 1 lists counsel of record for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice ProHac Vice in this case. Please see Local Rule 83.2.5 for this courts Procedures for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. 2. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (mm)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7168898) filed by Dale Wayne Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Benjamin R. Granger added to party Dale Wayne Gordon(pty:pla).(Granger, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Matthew Robert Slaughter
Represented By: Patrick A. Talley, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Wayne Gordon
Represented By: Benjamin R. Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Wayne Gordon, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Granger
Represented By: Marc A. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?