Elite Investment Group, LLC v. Worley Claims Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Elite Investment Group, LLC
Defendant: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09985
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Worley Claims Services, LLC identifying Aquiline Worley Parent, LLC as corporate parent for Worley Claims Services, LLC. (Pelleteri, Erin) Modified text on 12/18/2018 (am).
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Worley Claims Services, LLC.(Pelleteri, Erin) Modified text on 12/18/2018 (am).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. FURTHER ORDERED #10 that the Motion to Expedite is dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/26/18. (clc)
November 23, 2018 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
November 23, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney should have selected the correct hearing Judge. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North at 11:00 a.m. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
November 23, 2018 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. **This is a duplicate filing of document 9 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Worley Claims Services, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pelleteri, Erin) Modified text/referral on 11/23/2018 (mm).
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Worley Claims Services, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Pelleteri, Erin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 DUPLICATE OF REC. DOC. 9 - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Worley Claims Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Erin E. Pelleteri added to party Worley Claims Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Pelleteri, Erin) Modified text on 11/23/2018 (mm).
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Worley Claims Services, LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Douglas, Donald) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/7/2018) (am). Modified text on 11/7/2018 (am).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Worley Claims Services, LLC. (am)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Worley Claims Services, LLC filed by Elite Investment Group, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Douglas, Donald) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/30/2018) (am). Modified text on 10/30/2018 (am).
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Worley Claims Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7193716) filed by Elite Investment Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, 2015 Lease)Attorney Donald C. Douglas, Jr added to party Elite Investment Group, LLC(pty:selreq).(Douglas, Donald) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/25/2018) (am). Modified text on 10/25/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Investment Group, LLC v. Worley Claims Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Represented By: Jan Marie Hayden
Represented By: Erin E. Pelleteri
Represented By: Ashley Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Donald C. Douglas, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?