Joseph et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eckert C. Green, Nelwyn LeBoeuf, Herbert T. Moore, Jr., Lamor A. Griffin, Robin A. Bourgeois, Janice M. Bazile, Lydia B. Claudet, Adrian Claudet, Glenn P. Mire, Alvin Roland, Jr., Jarmel C. Beckett, Thelma M. Cheek, Barbara A. Stemley, Janice M. Cook, Sterling Bazile, Wanda P. Baker, Burnetta T. Moore, Rosie L. Johnson, Jerry D. Parker, Cleveland D. Clement, Jr., Randall Nova, Paula M. Ketchens, Christian M. Marse, Kevin J. Zulli, Kathy B. Mabile, Herman Mitchell, Jr., Ulysses Joseph, Octave J. Mabile, Dawnnella A. Howell, Jacqueline Mitchell, Richard J. Deroche, Jr., Ursula M. Fobb, Linda F. Sami, Kerry J. Trosclair, Lillie M. Stemley, Alex Neal, DaWayne A. Gilyot, Leslie D. White, Melissa A. Zulli, Leonard J. Cheek, Melissa Tarver, R W Stoker, Candace M Peterson, Samantha J Trench, John J. Roy, Linda F Sami, Kawan T Lipps, Brandie L Williams, Vaughan C Watkins, Kevin Duhe, Kenny J Dykes, Jasmine D Dexter, Milton Keys, Jr., Macie L Thomas, Lester P Vicknair, Betty O Marse, Justice J Feist, DayShawn L Gibson, Angela M. Beckett, Terry Weston, Errolynn J Bourgeois, JaLaine A Bornes, Royal Burke, III, Lynn M Gordon, Brenda A Gueret, Kori L Smith, Sandra L Roy, Agnes W Allen, Jessica F August, Jesse L Vicknair, Regina A Burke, Tristan D Taylor, Allen J Smith, Justin A Lopez, Jr., Stafoin A Francois, Jawane D Jenkins, June L Wolfe, Griffin Zia'Shon, Latosha B Gilyot, Nolan Gray, Joseph D Milioto, Greta M Henderson, Camille W Oubre, Ramon M Jackson, Raymond Stemley, Ethel W Stemley, Timothy R Thomas, Rachel L Collier, Ryan T Weston, Keiara L Neal, Sandra A Weston, Dianne E Saunders, Kevin L Kliebert, Patti S Trosclair, Steve Boudreaux, Sr., Bruce C Trosclair, Elmira B Duhe, Janet M Torres, Andrenese Thomas, Joy M Kliebert, Ryan E McGuire, Ronnie E Feist, II, Claudette V Luke, Susan S Derenbecker, Nikeithia R Duhe, Robin A Lewis, Suzanne M Kliebert, Craig WIlliams, Sr., Duane J Hymel, Jr., Trey P Perrilloux, Cardin J White, Clement Gray, III, Jeremy B James, Kathleen A Stoker, Brandon L Grows, Melissa Boudreaux, Kaleena S Fleming, Marlo D Nelson, Diana L Ruiz, Chrishelle J Keller, James Cambre, III, Mone't J Boudreaux, Jarmesha D Jenkins, Charles J Ketchens, Elliot P Mire, William A Percy, Jonathan A Anderson, Andre Barritt, Peggy G Creecy, JePrece L Barritt, Christine Woodward, Calvin J Vicknair, Clarence Smith, Tameka L Charles, Angelina M Collier, Sierra A Conner, Tina M Hebert, Toi T Green, Edward Toney, Charles Robinson, Ronnie E Feist, I, Adrien E Vicknair, Ronald J Stein, Corey J Ladner, Marion F Lewis, Nelson Gordon, Freddie Populis, Jr, Joseph Stein, Jr., Annette E Stewart, Carol E Williams, David E Brackers, Susan K Abt, Niya N Clay, Janice V Stein and Shalana F Harry
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, DowDuPont, Inc., Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, The Dow Chemical Company and Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv09995
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' motion that the stay of this matter is hereby lifted; and that this matter is hereby remanded to the 40th Judicial District Court for St. John the Baptist Parish. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (dno)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying, without prejudice, the #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to reurge at a later date. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/18. (dno)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Lift Stay and Remand by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doguet, Joshua)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that this matter is temporarily stayed pending a decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in the related matters. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/2018. (sa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doguet, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Doguet, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party Denka Performance Elastomer LLC(pty:dft).(Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (jeg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Dow Chemical Company of related case(s) 17-7668; 18-5739; 18-6685; 18-6692; 18-7017; 18-7936. (Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (jeg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th JDC, St. John the Baptist Parish, case number 72785 Div B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7194074) filed by The Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - DPE Consent, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Notice)Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party DowDuPont, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft).(Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eckert C. Green
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelwyn LeBoeuf
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert T. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamor A. Griffin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin A. Bourgeois
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice M. Bazile
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia B. Claudet
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Claudet
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn P. Mire
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Roland, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmel C. Beckett
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma M. Cheek
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Stemley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice M. Cook
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Bazile
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda P. Baker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnetta T. Moore
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie L. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry D. Parker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland D. Clement, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Nova
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula M. Ketchens
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian M. Marse
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Zulli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy B. Mabile
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Mitchell, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Joseph
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octave J. Mabile
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawnnella A. Howell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Deroche, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula M. Fobb
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Sami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry J. Trosclair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie M. Stemley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Neal
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaWayne A. Gilyot
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie D. White
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Zulli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard J. Cheek
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Tarver
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R W Stoker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace M Peterson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha J Trench
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Roy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F Sami
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawan T Lipps
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandie L Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughan C Watkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Duhe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny J Dykes
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine D Dexter
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Keys, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macie L Thomas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester P Vicknair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty O Marse
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice J Feist
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DayShawn L Gibson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Beckett
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Weston
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errolynn J Bourgeois
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JaLaine A Bornes
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Burke, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda A Gueret
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori L Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L Roy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes W Allen
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica F August
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse L Vicknair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina A Burke
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan D Taylor
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen J Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin A Lopez, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stafoin A Francois
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawane D Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June L Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griffin Zia'Shon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha B Gilyot
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Gray
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D Milioto
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta M Henderson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille W Oubre
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon M Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Stemley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel W Stemley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R Thomas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel L Collier
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan T Weston
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiara L Neal
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra A Weston
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne E Saunders
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L Kliebert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti S Trosclair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Boudreaux, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce C Trosclair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmira B Duhe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet M Torres
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrenese Thomas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy M Kliebert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan E McGuire
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie E Feist, II
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette V Luke
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan S Derenbecker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikeithia R Duhe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin A Lewis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M Kliebert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig WIlliams, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane J Hymel, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trey P Perrilloux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardin J White
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clement Gray, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy B James
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A Stoker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon L Grows
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Boudreaux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleena S Fleming
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlo D Nelson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana L Ruiz
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrishelle J Keller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cambre, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mone't J Boudreaux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmesha D Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J Ketchens
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot P Mire
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Percy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A Anderson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Barritt
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy G Creecy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JePrece L Barritt
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Woodward
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin J Vicknair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka L Charles
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina M Collier
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra A Conner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M Hebert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toi T Green
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Toney
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Robinson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie E Feist, I
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrien E Vicknair
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Stein
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey J Ladner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion F Lewis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Populis, Jr
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stein, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette E Stewart
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol E Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Brackers
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Abt
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niya N Clay
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice V Stein
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalana F Harry
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DowDuPont, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denka Performance Elastomer LLC
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Justin J. Marocco
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Represented By: Michael A. Chernekoff
Represented By: Brett S. Venn
Represented By: Michael R. Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?