Cartozzo et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Byron K. Roberson, Jr., Rita T. Austin, Charles Freeman, Florence E. Jackson, Ayana L. Kelly, Rebecca A. Dock, Patricia M. Keating, Joy M. Aubert, Claudette S. Raphael, La'Shae Roussell, Govanna G. Belvin, Evelyn K. Edwards, Cathy K. Cartozzo, Shandrika L. Dumas, Alvin Kelly, Germaine H. Jasmin, Frances M. Dumas, Kelvin D. York, Gail S. Zeno, Jenaire D. Jeffrey, Nickever M. Narcisse, Shernell D. Long, Ja'Shae M. Dumas, Ruby R. Zenon, RaeNell R. Augillard, Jeannine A. Taylor, Dorothy L. Fontenette, Keisha L. York, Terrion M. Beverly, JoAnn M. Jasmin, Lionel Temple, Ramona A. Kelly, Sam J. Cartozzo, Gregory J. Shepard, Delvin J. Harry, Kevin J. Robertson, Elie C. Jackson, Ana R. Mendieta, Trinity R. Charles, Daishana M. Oubre, Kasia L. Clofer, Angela G. Johnson, Darrell Joseph, Courtney M. Washington, Perry M. Toledano, Andrew Sterling, Jr, Allen L. Washington, Randez A. Watkins, Merlin B. Alexis, Kelly L. Williams, Shryelle M. Narcisse, Gaylen S. Lightell, Shawn A. Ketchens, Sr., Mark A. Coleman, Kristopher M. Kraemer, Anita N. Favors, Cornelius AJ Williams, Jr., Christy J. Howard, Gloria W. Starwood, DeJae M. Jasmin, Darius T. Williams, John Abt, Herbert Bazile, Suzette M. Williams, Thaddeus J. Breaux, Adam R. Bause, Levar L. Isom, Joseph E. Steib, Ethelene Hampton, Jarrid R. Ferrygood, Gail M. White, Marissa M. Gordon, Byron A. Bailey, Marion R. Matthews, Lisa R. Seymore, Fred Richardson, IV, Kenneth J. Frazier, Tomie F. Cumbie, Valerie A. Milow, Tiffany B. Lenoir, Nicole R. Picou, Cleona M. Bethancourt, Anthony Aubert, Deidra M. Zenon, Ashley M. Simon, Terrence G. Jasmin, Karl M. Schexnayder, Jamiah L. Sorapuru, Salvatore X. Graffia, Clara M. Williams, Tren A. Isom, Mica M. Jeffers, Erica S. Mitchell, Darlene T. Schexnayder, Jared A. Byers, Kendrick M. Isom, Hailynn A. Johnson, Jocelyn P. Hayes, Loyce B. Vedol, Chillia I. Jasmin, Julie S. Green, Olethia Davis, Ginger L. Breaud, Mikeal M. Gauthier, Rosemary S. Simon, Shelita L. McCoy, Adrian V. Richardson, Darwin J. Octave, Janice J. Holmes, Prescott A. Bailey, Jr., Lameka T. Williams, Sandra J. Sylvain, Latoya J. Juniors, Tammy D. Sorapura, Gloria A. Anderson, Kenneth J. Ellis, Ron K. Duhon, Conchata E. Lewis, Mary Tapp, Lamier J. Malancon, Wayne J. Perry, Emily M. Steib, Le'Shea R. Duhon, Carlis A. Nabors, Ricky J. Nelson, Shirley S. Baker, Felicia O. Williams, Duane R. Smith, Sr., Jo A. Byers, Clifford J. Bailey, Leora S. Mack, Skii D. James, Nicholas J. Dumas, James T. Stasha, Michele C. Jackson, Warner A. Sylvain, Arthur J. Bosworth, IV, Agnes M. Washington, Monica A. Jasmin, Roland A. LaBranche, Jr., De'Andra N. Dumas, Jarmaine A. Mitchell, Jermaine B. Duhe, Danyda T. Lenoir, K'Occia A. Poret, Patrick Jasmin, Lona R. Millet, Cheryl A. Picou, Destoni M. Hurst, Veronica M. Weber, Jaime S. Ladner, Levi Byers, Sr., Edwina V. Jackson, Gloria M. Butler and Christina M. Tabb
Defendant: DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Dow Chemical Company and Denka Performance Elastomer LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10007
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Lift Stay and Remand. This matter is hereby remanded to the 40th Judicial District Court for St. John the Baptist Parish. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (clc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Lift Stay and Remand by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doguet, Joshua)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Stay. The case is hereby closed administratively for statistical purposes, to be re-opened upon proper motion by the parties. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/5/2018. (clc)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to answer or file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages is extended by 21 days to November 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/2/2018. (cbs)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Dow Chemical Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Court has recently become aware that the subject matter of the above captioned case appears to be related to that asserted in Civil Action No. 17-7668, Taylor, et al. v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, et al., previously allotted to Section "F"(4) of this Court. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to Section "F" District Judge Martin C. Feldman and (4) Magistrate Karen Wells Roby for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/1/2018.(cg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doguet, Joshua)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay by Denka Performance Elastomer LLC, DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party Denka Performance Elastomer LLC(pty:dft).(Doguet, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by DowDuPont, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Dow Chemical Company of related case(s) 17-7668; 18-5739; 18-6685; 18-6692; 18-7017; 18-7936. (Doguet, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th JDC, St. John the Baptist Parish, case number 72872 "A" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7194284) filed by DowDuPont, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party DowDuPont, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Doguet added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft).(Doguet, Joshua) Modified text on 11/2/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartozzo et al v. Denka Performance Elastomer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron K. Roberson, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita T. Austin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Freeman
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence E. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayana L. Kelly
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. Dock
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M. Keating
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy M. Aubert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette S. Raphael
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Shae Roussell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Govanna G. Belvin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn K. Edwards
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy K. Cartozzo
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandrika L. Dumas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Kelly
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine H. Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances M. Dumas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin D. York
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail S. Zeno
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenaire D. Jeffrey
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickever M. Narcisse
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shernell D. Long
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ja'Shae M. Dumas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby R. Zenon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RaeNell R. Augillard
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine A. Taylor
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy L. Fontenette
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha L. York
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrion M. Beverly
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn M. Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Temple
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona A. Kelly
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam J. Cartozzo
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Shepard
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delvin J. Harry
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Robertson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elie C. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana R. Mendieta
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity R. Charles
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daishana M. Oubre
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasia L. Clofer
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela G. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Joseph
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney M. Washington
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry M. Toledano
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sterling, Jr
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen L. Washington
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randez A. Watkins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlin B. Alexis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shryelle M. Narcisse
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylen S. Lightell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn A. Ketchens, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Coleman
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher M. Kraemer
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita N. Favors
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius AJ Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy J. Howard
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria W. Starwood
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeJae M. Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius T. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Abt
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Bazile
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette M. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus J. Breaux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam R. Bause
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levar L. Isom
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Steib
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethelene Hampton
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrid R. Ferrygood
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail M. White
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa M. Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron A. Bailey
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion R. Matthews
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa R. Seymore
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Richardson, IV
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Frazier
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomie F. Cumbie
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie A. Milow
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany B. Lenoir
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole R. Picou
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleona M. Bethancourt
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Aubert
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra M. Zenon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Simon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence G. Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl M. Schexnayder
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamiah L. Sorapuru
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore X. Graffia
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara M. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tren A. Isom
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mica M. Jeffers
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica S. Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene T. Schexnayder
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared A. Byers
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick M. Isom
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailynn A. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn P. Hayes
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyce B. Vedol
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chillia I. Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie S. Green
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olethia Davis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger L. Breaud
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikeal M. Gauthier
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary S. Simon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelita L. McCoy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian V. Richardson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin J. Octave
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice J. Holmes
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescott A. Bailey, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lameka T. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Sylvain
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya J. Juniors
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy D. Sorapura
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria A. Anderson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Ellis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron K. Duhon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conchata E. Lewis
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tapp
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamier J. Malancon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Perry
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily M. Steib
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le'Shea R. Duhon
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlis A. Nabors
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky J. Nelson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley S. Baker
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia O. Williams
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane R. Smith, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo A. Byers
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Bailey
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leora S. Mack
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skii D. James
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas J. Dumas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Stasha
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele C. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner A. Sylvain
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur J. Bosworth, IV
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes M. Washington
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica A. Jasmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland A. LaBranche, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Andra N. Dumas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmaine A. Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine B. Duhe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyda T. Lenoir
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K'Occia A. Poret
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Jasmin
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lona R. Millet
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Picou
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destoni M. Hurst
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica M. Weber
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime S. Ladner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Byers, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwina V. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria M. Butler
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Tabb
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert Ronald Faucheux, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Cummings, III
Represented By: Randal Leroy Gaines
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Sylvia Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Darryl Jude Tschirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DowDuPont, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denka Performance Elastomer LLC
Represented By: Joshua Doguet
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Justin J. Marocco
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Represented By: Brett S. Venn
Represented By: Michael R. Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?