Fabulous Pewterware, LLC v. Barbagallo et al
Plaintiff: Fabulous Pewterware, LLC
Defendant: Barbagallo Company, Carlos Barbagallo, James E. Martin and Associates, Inc. and Barbagallo Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10214
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to James E. Martin and Associates, Inc., Carlos Barbagallo, and Barbagallo Company LLC. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings by 1/21/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants previous #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time, which mistakenly requested an extension until 2/21/2019, is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/19/2018. (jls)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Carlos Barbagallo, Barbagallo Company LLC, James E. Martin and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whitfield, Marc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (am)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Fabulous Pewterware, LLC re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer due to erroneous request for 52-day extension to February 21 2019. (Breaux, Marie) Modified text on 12/19/2018 (am).
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Carlos Barbagallo, Barbagallo Company LLC, James E. Martin and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Marc S. Whitfield added to party Carlos Barbagallo(pty:dft), Attorney Marc S. Whitfield added to party Barbagallo Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marc S. Whitfield added to party James E. Martin and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).(Whitfield, Marc) Modified text on 12/19/2018 (am).
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Marie Breaux of Amended Complaint served on Barbagallo Company LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018, Carlos Barbagallo served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018, and James E. Martin and Associates, Inc served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Breaux, Marie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (am).
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carlos Barbagallo, Barbagallo Company LLC, James E. Martin and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Carlos Barbagallo, Barbagallo Company LLC, James E. Martin and Associates, Inc. filed by Fabulous Pewterware, LLC re #4 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barbagallo Company LLC dba Pampa Bay, #2 Summons Carlos Barbagallo, #3 Summons James E Martin and Associates Inc)(Breaux, Marie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/7/2018) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/7/2018) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/7/2018) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (am).
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against All Defendants filed by Fabulous Pewterware, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G)(Breaux, Marie) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (am).
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos Barbagallo, Barbagallo Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7204202) filed by Fabulous Pewterware, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to G, #2 Summons two in globo one for each defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Marie Breaux added to party Fabulous Pewterware, LLC(pty:pla).(Breaux, Marie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #4 AO Form 121) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabulous Pewterware, LLC v. Barbagallo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbagallo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Barbagallo
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Marc S. Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Martin and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Marc S. Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbagallo Company LLC
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Marc S. Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabulous Pewterware, LLC
Represented By: Marie Breaux
Represented By: Marjorie Ruth Esman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?