Johnson v. New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation
Plaintiff: TERRY R JOHNSON and Terry Johnson
Defendant: New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Company and New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv10532
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Terry Johnson (Granger, Benjamin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (kac)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation.(Talbot, Brent)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation; answer due 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/10/18. (clc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect party served. New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 No further action is necessary.** (clc) Modified text on 12/7/2018 (clc).
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brent A. Talbot added to party New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation(pty:dft).(Talbot, Brent)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Granger, Benjamin) Modified on 12/7/2018 (clc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 *DEFICIENT* SUMMONS Returned Executed; Terry Johnson served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Granger, Benjamin) Modified on 12/5/2018 (sa).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc A. Zito. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/08/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation. (sa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marc A. Zito (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7216927) by Terry Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 CMEFC Form)(Granger, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (sa).
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7216122) filed by Terry Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney Benjamin R. Granger added to party Terry Johnson(pty:pla).(Granger, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation
Represented By: Rosalie Margaret Haug
Represented By: Brent A. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY R JOHNSON
Represented By: Benjamin R. Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin R. Granger
Represented By: Marc A. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?