Goldring et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: William Goldring and Jane Goldring
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv10756
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Barry W Ashe
1 Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER Granting #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory Rhodes. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice)(am)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER Granting #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Wooldridge. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice)(am)
November 29, 2018 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory Rhodes (Fee previously paid) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Gregory Rhodes, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 29, 2018 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Wooldridge (Fee previously paid) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of David Wooldridge, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Registration form)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michelle A. Levin. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hac Vice Attorney) (mmv).
November 26, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States of America served on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 - signed green card)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 26, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Attachments: #1 - signed green card)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 26, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States of America served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 - signed green card)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 26, 2018 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michelle Levin (Fee previously paid) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Rosenberg, Harry)
November 20, 2018 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs for David M. Wooldridge re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) {LAE053025 payment for all three attorneys} (djg)
November 20, 2018 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs for Gregory P Rhodes re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (djg)
November 20, 2018 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs for Michelle Levin re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (djg)
November 19, 2018 7 *DEFICIENT* EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - David M. Wooldridge (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Wooldridge Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Rosenberg, Harry) Modified on 11/20/2018 (sa).
November 19, 2018 6 *DEFICIENT* EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Gregory P. Rhodes (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Rhodes Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Rosenberg, Harry) Modified on 11/20/2018 (sa).
November 19, 2018 5 *DEFICIENT* EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michelle Levin (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Jane Goldring, William Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Levin Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Rosenberg, Harry) Modified on 11/20/2018 (sa).
November 13, 2018 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 13, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
November 9, 2018 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7226307) filed by William Goldring, Jane Goldring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons IRS NOLA, #6 Summons USAG Louisiana, #7 Summons USAG, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Harry Rosenberg added to party Jane Goldring(pty:pla), Attorney Harry Rosenberg added to party William Goldring(pty:pla).(Rosenberg, Harry) (Attachment 8 replaced on 11/13/2018) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldring et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Goldring
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Michelle A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Wooldridge
Represented By: Gregory P. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Goldring
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Michelle A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Wooldridge
Represented By: Gregory P. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?