Chiu et al v. Lincoln et al

Plaintiff: Yu-Wen Chiu and Chih-Yang Hu
Defendant: Charles Edward Lincoln, III and Charles Edward Lincoln, IV
Petitioner: Anita Harris
Case Number: 2:2018cv10883
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Martin LC Feldman
1 Judge: Daniel E Knowles
2 Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
3 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 4 MOTION to Intervene by Anita Harris. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(am)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/10/18.(CC:SECTION F& B, MAG 1& 3) (clc)
November 14, 2018 2 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Charles Edward Lincoln, III. By the Clerk on 11/14/2018.(jeg)
November 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First City Court, City of New Orleans, case number 2017-0843, Div D (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Charles Edward Lincoln, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-B, #3 Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit C part 3, #6 Exhibit C part 4, #7 Exhibit D)(jeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiu et al v. Lincoln et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Edward Lincoln, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Edward Lincoln, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu-Wen Chiu
Represented By: Matthew P. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chih-Yang Hu
Represented By: Matthew P. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anita Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?