Rooney et al v. Pella Corporation
Plaintiff: H. Patrick Rooney and Maryann Rooney
Defendant: Pella Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv11158
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct . **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is AMENDED Complaint. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Complaint by H. Patrick Rooney. (Rooney, Hugh) Modified text/Event on 11/21/2018 (jeg).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint no later than December 3, 2018. The amended complaint must properly allege the citizenship of Defendant Pella Corporation and provide more detail regarding the amount in controversy. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pella Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7242149) filed by Maryann Rooney, H. Patrick Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Hugh Patrick Rooney added to party H. Patrick Rooney(pty:pla).(Rooney, Hugh) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (sbs). (WAIVER OF SERVICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooney et al v. Pella Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pella Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Patrick Rooney
Represented By: Hugh Patrick Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Rooney
Represented By: Hugh Patrick Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?