Ross v. Dejarnetti
Plaintiff: Freddie Ross, Jr.
Defendant: Wilberto Dejarnetti
Case Number: 2:2018cv11277
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Document did not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section G and Magistrate 4.** (mm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wilberto Dejarnetti. (mm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kappel, Timothy) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/10/2018) (mm).
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Wilberto Dejarnetti (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7249004) filed by Freddie Ross, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Timothy R.W. Kappel added to party Freddie Ross, Jr(pty:pla).(Kappel, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Dejarnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Ross, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy R.W. Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilberto Dejarnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?