Dretar v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dretar, as managing member of the Louisiana Housing Program LLC, and as the independent administrator of the Succession of Debra Dretar and Kenneth Dretar
Defendant: John Vicari, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Produc and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv11666
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Deethardt, Mark) Modified on 12/24/2018 (jeg).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company Answer Due 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/06/2018. (jeg)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deethardt, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Deethardt, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corp. for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (jeg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. By the Clerk.(jeg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
November 28, 2018 Filing fee received : $ 400 - Receipt #LAE053138 (gk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-10275 Div M, Sec 13 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark R. Deethardt added to party Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (pty:dft).(Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dretar v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vicari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Produc
Represented By: Mark R. Deethardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Mark R. Deethardt
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dretar, as managing member of the Louisiana Housing Program LLC, and as the independent administrator of the Succession of Debra Dretar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dretar
Represented By: Miles Gregory Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?