Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Capital One National Bank et al
Trustee: U.S. Trustee, S.J. Beaulieu, Jr. and S. J. Beaulieu, Jr.
Appellee: Capital One National Bank and Maureen Philips LeBlanc
Appellant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv11748
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPTS of Bankruptcy Hearings held on 7/27/18, 8/29/18 before Judge Elizabeth W. Magner. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 USBC Transcript) (clc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File appellant brief. ORDERED that Ocwen is granted a ten-day extension of time, or until February 1, 2019, to file its appellant brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/16/19. (clc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balhoff, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 1/28/2019. (clc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Complete Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. There was no Appellant or Appellee Designations filed into the record. (Attachments: #1 USBC- Docket Sheet and Order)(clc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Magner. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 USBC- Order, #2 USBC- Docket Sheet, #3 USBC- Transmittal Letter)(clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Capital One National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: S.J. Beaulieu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: S. J. Beaulieu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Capital One National Bank
Represented By: Lance J. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maureen Philips LeBlanc
Represented By: Darryl Thomas Landwehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Alex Edward Hotard
Represented By: Blake Bryant Goodsell
Represented By: Elwood F. Cahill, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?