Doe v. Tangipahoa Parish School System, et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Tangipahoa Parish School System and Dwayne Brown
Case Number: 2:2018cv12345
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441pe
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jane Doe re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Brumfield, Charles)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Resetting Submission Date re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/28/18.(clc) Modified text on 1/2/2019 (jls).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of January 9, 2019. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mmv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of January 9, 2019 re rec doc 3 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brumfield, Charles) Modified text/removed referral on 12/28/2018 (mmv).
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tangipahoa Parish School System. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Moody, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC Parish of Tanghipahoa, case number 2018-3134 Div. D (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7278948) filed by Tangipahoa Parish School System. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Compliance)Attorney Christopher M. Moody added to party Tangipahoa Parish School System(pty:dft).(Moody, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2018) (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2018: #4 SEALED Financial Affidavit) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Tangipahoa Parish School System, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tangipahoa Parish School System
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Represented By: Albert David Giraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Charles Edward Brumfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?