United States of America v. St. Bernard Parish
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish and St Bernard Parish
Case Number: 2:2018cv12667
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: IT IS ORDERED that #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED. The above matter is hereby consolidated with 2:17-cv-07360-JCZ-JVM. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation ALL CASES if it applies to all cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines in both actions are STAYED pending further orders of the Court. The United States will file a motion to lift the stay once funding to the Department of Justice is restored. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/3/2019. (RE: 18-12667, 17-7360) (NEF: Magistrate Judge van Meerveld) (ajn)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: ORDERED that the Government's #19 Motion to Expedite is GRANTED. The #18 Motion to Stay filed by the Government is GRANTED. The status conference set for Thursday, January 3, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/27/18. (clc)(CC: Counsel of Record in 17-7360)
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Stay Proceedings by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Towt, Katharine)
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Towt, Katharine)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Expedite Submission of Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/3/2019. Status Conference set for 1/3/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/18/18.(jrc)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll additional counsel Christopher David Belen for United States of America. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by United States of America re #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (mm)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/18/2018. (mm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in support of Consolidation by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Sinkman, David)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Christopher Belen by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sinkman, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by St Bernard Parish re #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Garner, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Submission of Motion to Expedite Discovery by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sinkman, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Sinkman, David)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Expedite; ORDER Setting submission date on #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/11/18.(jrc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to St Bernard Parish on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sinkman, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate Cases. ***Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Motions that are set for submission are not Exparte. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 1/9/2019 before Judge Jay C. Zainey and has removed 'Exparte' from the docket text.*** (ajn)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Joint Motion for Consolidation by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Towt, Katharine)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Towt, Katharine) Modified text on 12/11/2018 to add submission and remove 'Exparte/Consent.(ajn).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Carl Barbier, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/10/2018.(mm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St. Bernard Parish (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. NOTICE BY WAIVER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David H Sinkman added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Sinkman, David) Modified on 12/10/2018 (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. St. Bernard Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Bernard Parish
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Debra J. Fischman
Represented By: David Adam Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David H Sinkman
Represented By: Katharine Farrell Towt
Represented By: Christopher David Belen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?