Taylor Energy Company LLC v. Luttrell et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company LLC and Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.
Defendant: United States of America, Captain Kristi M Luttrell and Kristi M. Luttrell
Consolidated Defendant: Couvillion Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv14046
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Kristi M. Luttrell, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-14051)Attorney Erica Monique Zilioli added to party Kristi M. Luttrell(pty:dft), Attorney Erica Monique Zilioli added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Zilioli, Erica)
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional and Renewed MOTION to Expedite Pre-Trial Conference and Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery. Please, disregard the previously issued deficiency. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (Reference: 18-14051)(am)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. regarding #29 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional and Renewed MOTION to Expedite Pre-Trial Conference and Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-14051)(Bertram, Richard) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (am).
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional and Renewed, MOTION to Expedite Pre-Trial Conference and Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 18-14051)(Bertram, Richard) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (am).
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b).**In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) by Couvillion Group LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Denny, Danica) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (am).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE: #23 Motion for Expedited Pretrial Conference and for Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery, #24 Motion for Expedited Hearing, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/16/2019. (Reference: 18-14051)(am)
January 15, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Couvillion Group LLC re #23 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference and Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 18-14051)(Denny, Danica)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite #23 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference and for Entry of Scheduling Order by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-14051)(sbs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference and for Entry of Scheduling Order Allowing for Expedited Discovery by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 18-14051)(sbs)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Civil Action No. 18-14051 is consolidated with 18-14046. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/11/19.(sbs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Summons Returned Executed, #18 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA, #19 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA, #16 Summons Returned Executed, #17 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Affidavit of service. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (am)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille T. Bourg, Jr. of Summons served on Kristi M. Luttrell on 12/29/2018, answer due 03/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (am).
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille T. Bourg, Jr. of Summons served on United States Coast Guard on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (am).
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille T. Bourg, Jr. of Summons served on United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (am).
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille T. Bourg, Jr. of Summons served on Assistant Attorney General for Administration of the United States on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (am).
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille T. Bourg, Jr. of Summons served on Attorney General of the United States on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (am).
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell, United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell, United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (am).
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Request for Summons Issued, #8 Request for Summons Issued, #7 Request for Summons Issued, #4 Request for Summons Issued, #5 Request for Summons Issued, #10 Request for Summons Issued, #6 Request for Summons Issued, #3 Request for Summons Issued.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(am)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to United States of America filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Kristi M Luttrell filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2018) (am). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (am).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristi M Luttrell, United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7316262) filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit) Attorney Carl David Rosenblum added to party Taylor Energy Company LLC(pty:pla).(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Energy Company LLC v. Luttrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company LLC
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Richard D. Bertram
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erica Monique Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kristi M Luttrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi M. Luttrell
Represented By: Erica Monique Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Couvillion Group LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Danica Benbow Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?